Newlands Asset Holding Trust v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Newlands Asset Holding Trust
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Stonefield Homeowners Association
Case Number: 3:2017cv00370
Filed: June 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting ECF No. 93 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Christopher A.J. Swift withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 64 ) is denied without prejudice; SFR's motion to strike (ECF No. 70 ) is denied; SFR's motion for Rule 56(d) relief (ECF No. 71 ) is granted; discover y is reopened until 7/21/2019; any renewed motions for summary judgment must be filed within 30 days of the end of the reopened 45-day discovery period. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting ECF No. 75 Stipulation To Extend Time (Second Request) : Carisbrook's Reply to ECF No. 64 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/31/2018. Carisbrook's Responses to ECF Nos. 70 , 71 Motions due by 10/31/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting ECF No. 73 Stipulation : Carisbrook's Reply to ECF No. 69 Response re ECF No. 64 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/24/2018. Carisbrook's Responses to ECF Nos. 70 , 71 Motions due by 10/24/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting ECF No. 67 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response to ECF No. 64 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (First Request). SFR's Response due by 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER approving ECF No. 55 Stipulation of Bank of America NA's Disclaimer of Current Interest and Dismissal. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting ECF No. 53 Stipulation for Extension of Time for BANA to Respond to ECF No. 27 SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Cross-Claim. BANA's answer/response to ECF No. 27 SFR's cross-claim due by 3/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting ECF No. 19 Motion to Substitute Party; Clerk directed to substitute Carisbrook Asset Holding Trust into this case as the plaintiff in place and stead of Newlands Asset Hold Trust; denying ECF No. 16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying ECF No. 12 Motion for Security of Costs. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newlands Asset Holding Trust v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newlands Asset Holding Trust
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonefield Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?