Richardson v. Reno Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Arthur D. Richardson
Defendant: Aaron Flickinger, Christopher Good, Wesley Leedy and Reno Police Department
Case Number: 3:2017cv00383
Filed: June 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - Due to the recent outbreak of the Coronavirus Disease 2019 (COVID-19) and pursuant to the Temporary General Order 2020-04, the Settlement Conference scheduled on Tuesday, April 14, 2020 at 9:00am is VACATED and will reset as soon as the Court's calendar will accommodate it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 3/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 57 ) is denied.Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement (ECF No. 59 ) is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 36 Motion to Extend Time : The Case Management Conference set on Monday, September 10, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. is VACATED. The Courtroom Administrator shall reschedule the Case Management Conference as soon as the court's calendar will accommodate it. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 15 ) is denied; and Plaintiff's motion to stay (ECF No. 22 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb ECF No. 7 Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted in its entirety; plaintiff's IFP ECF No. 1 is granted; Clerk directed to detach and file complaint EC F No. 1 -1; plaintiff to be permitted to proceed with claims against Defendants Good, Flickinger and Leedy; claim against Reno Police Department is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's IFP ECF No. re 5 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be GRANTED; Clerk should be directed to FILE complaint ECF No. 1 -1; plaintiff to be permitted to PROCEED with Fourth Amendment excessive force claims against Good, Flickinger and Leedy; the Reno Police Department should be DISMISSED, but Plaintiff given 30 days to file an amended complaint. Objections to R&R due by 11/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Reno Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Flickinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Leedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reno Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur D. Richardson
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?