Garmong v. Tahoe Regional Planning Agency et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Gregory Garmong
Defendant: Shelly Aldean, Jim Baetge, Marsha Berkbigler, Casey Beyer, Mark Bruce, Tim Carlson, Timothy Cashman, Barbara Cegavske, Complete Wireless Consulting, Inc., Bridget Cornell, Crown Castle, Belinda Faustinos, Maria Kim, James Lawrence, Joanne Marchetta, Mr. John Marshall, Nancy McDermid, Sue Novasel, Austin Sass, Larry Sevason, E. Clement Shute, Jr., Tahoe Regional Planning Agency, Verizon Wireless, Inc. and Bill Yeates
Case Number: 3:2017cv00444
Filed: July 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting ECF No. 153 Stipulation. Defendants' Replies to Plaintiff's Oppositions (ECF Nos. 149 , 151 , 152 ) as to the Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 137 , 141 , 142 ) are due by January 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting ECF No. 147 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 145 Motion to Extend Time due by 1/8/2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting ECF No. 144 Stipulation. Plaintiff shall have to and including January 8, 2021 to respond to the Motions to Dismiss (ECF No. 137 / 140 , 141 , 142 ). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER - Defendants shall file an updated response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 89 ) by December 4, 2020. Plaintiff may file an updated reply to this response by December 18, 2020. Defendants shall fi le their Motions to Dismiss the Operative Complaint by December 4, 2020. Responses and replies to these motions shall follow the ordinary course of briefing as dictated by the LR 7-2(b). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting ECF No. 118 Motion to Withdraw Matthew C. Addison and Sarah Ferguson as Counsel for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER that the Motion for Preliminary Injunction ECF No. 89 is DENIED; the Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ECF No. 97 and the Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 101 are GRANTED; the Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 104 is DENIED as moot; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying ECF No. 88 Motion for TRO; denying as moot ECF Nos. 76 , 77 , and 81 Motions; setting Motion Hearing re ECF No. 89 Motion for Preliminary Injunction for 8/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDERED that the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 88 ) is DENIED. The Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 76 ), the Motion to Extend Time (ECF No. 77 ), and the Motion to Strike (ECF No. 81 ) are DENIED as moot. The parti es shall contact the Court to propose a mutually agreeable time for a hearing on the motion for a preliminary injunction (ECF No. 89 ). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting ECF No. 85 Stipulation : Answer/response to First Amended Complaint due by 7/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 6/19/2018 changed due date of answer/response to first amended complaint from 6/20/2018 to 7/20/2018 (WJ).
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER that the Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 17 & 34 ) are GRANTED, with leave to amend by 6/7/2018; the Motions to Strike (ECF Nos. 69 & 71 ) are DENIED; and the Motion to Extend Time (ECF No. 59 ) and Objection (ECF No. 60 ) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting ECF No. 42 Stipulation for Extension of Time re ECF Nos. 33 Joinder and 34 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due 12/29/2017. Replies due 1/12/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting ECF No. 31 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 17 Motion to Dismiss due by 12/8/2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 11/30/2017 for spelling (DRM).
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting ECF No. 27 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. 1 Complaint, Complete Wireless Consulting, Inc. and Maria Kim response/answer due 11/30/2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garmong v. Tahoe Regional Planning Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Aldean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Baetge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Berkbigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Cashman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Cegavske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Wireless Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridget Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Faustinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Marchetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. John Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy McDermid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Novasel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Sass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Sevason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Clement Shute, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahoe Regional Planning Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Yeates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Gregory Garmong
Represented By: Carl M. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?