SMC Construction Co. v. Rex Moore Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: SMC Construction Co.
Defendant: Rex Moore Group, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Rex Moore Group, Inc.
Counter Defendant: SMC Construction Co.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00470
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff's motion to release or reduce mechanic's lien ECF No. 5 is GRANTED; Defendant's mechanic's lien recorded on 07/10/2017, in the amount of $2,117,602.78 is REDUCED to $746,415.34. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days after entry of this order to file an appropriate motion seeking attorneys fees pursuant to NRS § 108.2275(6)(b). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 09/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 30, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that defendant's motion to strike, or in the alternative, for leave to file a sur-reply (ECF No. 21 ) is GRANTED : Defendant Rex Moore Group, Inc. is GRANTED leave to file a brief sur-reply to plaintiff's motion for release of mechanic's lien (ECF No. 5 ) of not more than 7 pages within 5 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 21, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting ECF No. 17 Motion to amend : ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for order to set hearing and to shorten time (ECF No. 6 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on plaintiff's motion to release or red uce mechanic's lien (ECF No. 5 ) is scheduled for Monday, September 11, 2017, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 3 at the Bruce R. Thompson courthouse in Reno, Nevada. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if lien claimant Rex Moore Group, Inc. fails to appear at the time and place noted above, the notice of lien will be released with prejudice and lien claimant Rex Moore Group, Inc. will be ordered to pay the reasonable costs applicant SMC Construction Co. incurred in bringing the underlying motion to release lien, including reasonable attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 14, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 6 Motion to Set hearing on Motion to Release or Reduce Mechanic's Lien and to Shorten Time ECF No. 5 . Hearing set for 9/11/2017 at 02:30 P.M. in Reno Courtroom 3 before Judge Larry R. Hicks. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 08/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 9, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL - The undersigned Judge recuses himself from this action. This action is referred to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro for reassignment. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMC Construction Co. v. Rex Moore Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Rex Moore Group, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Bragonje
Represented By: Patrick T. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Moore Group, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Bragonje
Represented By: Patrick T. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: SMC Construction Co.
Represented By: Scott L. Hernandez
Represented By: Kent R. Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMC Construction Co.
Represented By: Scott L. Hernandez
Represented By: Kent R. Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?