Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Winecup Ranch, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Defendant: Paul Fireman, Winecup Gamble, Inc. and Winecup Ranch, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00477
Filed: August 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER regarding motions in limine. • DENYING ECF Nos. 111 Union Pacific's first motion in limine; 112 Union Pacific's second motion in limine; 123 Union Pacific's fourth motion in limine; 139 U nion Pacific's fiffth and sixth motions in limine; 124 Union Pacific's seventh motion in limine; 126 Union Pacific's ninth motion in limine; 127 Union Pacific's tenth motion in limine; 141 Winecup' ;s first motion in limine; 143 Winecup's second motion in limine • DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE ECF Nos. 128 and 175 Union Pacific's eleventh and nineteenth motion in limine; 129 Union Pacific's twelfth motion in limine; 130 Union Pacific's thirteenth motion in limine; 131 Union Pacific's fourteenth motion in limine; 133 Union Pacific's sixteenth motion in limine; 134 Union Pacific's seventeenth moti on in limine; 150 Winecup's fourth motion in limine; 151 Winecup's fifth motion in limine • GRANTING ECF Nos. 132 Union Pacific's fifteenth motion in limine; 176 Union Pacific's twen tieth motion in limine; 149 Winecup's third motion in limine; 142 Union Pacific's motion to seal • GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ECF Nos. 122 Union Pacific's third motion in limine; 125 Un ion Pacific's eighth motion in limine; 135 Union Pacific's eighteenth motion in limine; 152 Winecup's sixth motion in limine; 193 Union Pacific's twenty-first motion in limine • The parties are to submit an amended pretrial order within 45 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER - The Court GRANTS Union Pacific's motion for leave to file the requested motion in limine (ECF No. 188 ) within 5 days of the date of this Order. The Court further GRANTS Union Pacific's motion (ECF No. 188 ) to file it under seal with a redacted copy on the public record. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Union Pacific's ECF No. 137 Motion for a Hearing Schedule and Evidentiary Daubert Hearing; granting in part and denying in part Winecup Gamble's ECF No. 180 Motion for Oral Argument Hearing; directing the parties to seek leave of the Court before filing any additional motions in limine. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting ECF No. 185 Stipulation. Winecup's Responses to the Motions in Limine (ECF Nos. 175 , 176 ) due by June 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting ECF No. 145 Stipulation : Responses to all motions in limine that are filed by April 24, 2020, are due by 5/15/2020. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER approving ECF No. 121 Stipulation. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 2:30 PM before Judge Larry R. Hicks. Court Clerk will send dial-in information shortly. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting ECF No. 116 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting ECF No. 113 Stipulation for Extension of Time re ECF Nos. 111 and 112 Motions. Responses due by February 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDERED that this case is referred to The Honorable Carla L. Baldwin for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER approving ECF No. 99 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gary M. Elden on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael R. Kealy. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/15/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting ECF No. 96 Motion to Extend Time: Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 5/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting ECF No. 82 Stipulation for Extension of Discovery Deadlines (Third Request). Discovery due by 3/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 11/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting ECF No. 79 Stipulation : Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 11/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 11/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting ECF No. 59 Stipulation to Vacate Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2018 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on/ 5/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting ECF No. 56 Revised Stipulation and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting ECF No. 55 Stipulation and Request to Vacate Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/16/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting ECF No. 51 Stipulation to Vacate Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 3/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting ECF No. 46 Stipulation to Vacate Case Management Conference on 2/15/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting ECF No. 44 Stipulation and Request to Vacate Case Management Conference scheduled for 1/16/2018 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting ECF No. 39 Stipulation and Request to Vacate Case Management Conference set for 12/14/17 at 10:30 am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Winecup Ranch, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Fireman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winecup Gamble, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Jordan
Represented By: Michael Richard Menssen
Represented By: William E. Peterson
Represented By: Ryan Stodtmeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winecup Ranch, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Michael G. Chapman
Represented By: Anne Marie O'Brien
Represented By: Steven Michael Silva
Represented By: Michael L. Storey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?