Tyzbir v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Wendy Tyzbir
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2017cv00494
Filed: August 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that the Joint Stipulation for EAJA Fees (Docket No. 28 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiff is awarded $8,200.00 in attorney's fees. Astrue vs. Ratliff, 130 S. Ct. 2521, 2524 (2010), directs that the check should be made payable to Plaintiff and mailed to Plaintiff's Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb (ECF No. 21 ) is accepted. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF Nos. 15 , 16 ) is granted. Defendant's Cross-Motion to Affirm (ECF Nos. 19 , 20 ) is denied. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in accordance with this Order and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that ECF No. 1 IFP Application is GRANTED. The complaint shall PROCEED. Clerk shall FILE the complaint (ECF 1 -2). Clerk shall SERVE Commissioner SSA by sending a copy of the Summons and Com plaint by certified mail to: Regional Chief Counsel ; and U. S. Attorney General ( Cert Mail Nos. 7013 1710 0001 6894 2808, 7013 1710 0001 6894 2815 ). Clerk shall ISSUE a summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver summons and complaint for service by USM on U.S. Attorneys Office, Reno (Summons and complaint to USM on 08/31/2017). Hence forth P shall serve D a copy every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 08/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyzbir v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Beatrice H. Na
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Tyzbir
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?