Guzman v. State of Nevada et al
Petitioner: Marco Guzman
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General and Nevada, State of
Case Number: 3:2017cv00515
Filed: August 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 86 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner will have until and including April 3, 2023, to file his reply to Respondents' answer (ECF No. 84 ). In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered January 19, 2021 (ECF No. 54 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/1/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Respondents' Motions for Enlargement of Time (ECF Nos. 81 and 82 ) are GRANTED. Respondents will have until and including December 2, 2022, to file their answer (12/2/2022). In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered January 19, 2021 (ECF No. 54 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER - Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. 79 ) is GRANTED. Respondents will have until and including November 10, 2022, to file their answer. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered January 19, 2021 (ECF No. 54 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/13/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Respondents' Motion for Enlargementof Time (ECF No. 77 ) is GRANTED. Respondents will have until and including October 7, 2022, to file their answer (10/7/2022). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED t hat, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered January 19, 2021 (ECF No. 54 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/24/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJD)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDERED that Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. 75 ) is GRANTED. Respondents will have until and including August 23, 2022, to file their answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered January 19, 2021 (ECF No. 54 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. 73 ) is DENIED. Respondents' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 63 ) is DENIED. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery (ECF No. 70 ) is DEN IED. Respondents will have 120 days from the date of this order to file an answer (6/24/2022). In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered January 19, 2021 (ECF No. 54 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/24/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 67 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner will have until and including December 29, 2021, to respond to Respondents' motion to dismiss. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered January 19, 2021 (ECF No. 54 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 65 Motion to Extend Time : Petitioner will have until and including November 26, 2021, to respond to Respondents' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 63 ). In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered January 19, 2021 (ECF No. 54 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - Respondents Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. 61 ) is GRANTED. Respondents will have until and including July 27, 2021, to respond to the third amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered January 19, 2021 (ECF No. 54 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 7/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting ECF No. 59 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents will have until and including July 13, 2021, to respond to the third amended petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. 55 ). In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered January 19, 2021 (ECF No. 54 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting ECF No. 57 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents will have until and including June 3, 2021, to respond to the third amended petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. 55 ). In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered January 19, 2021 (ECF No. 54 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Reopen (ECF No. 46 ) is GRANTED. The stay of this action is lifted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to reopen this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. 47 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to separately file Petitioner's Third Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, located at ECF No. 47 -1. IT IS FU RTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal (ECF No. 50 ) is GRANTED. As the subject exhibit (Exhibit 56) has already been filed under seal (ECF No. 51 ), no further action is necessary in this regard. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. 53 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following schedule will govern further proceedings in this action : Answer/response to petition due 90 days from the date of this order (4/19/2021); (See pdf order for additional subsequent deadlines). Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/19/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying without prejudice ECF Nos. 28 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss and 33 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to conduct Discovery; Petitioner will have until 4/5/2019 to file motion to stay; Respondents will have 30 days to respond; Petitioner will have 20 days to reply. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. 35 ) is GRANTED. The respondents will have until January 22, 2019, to file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss (ECF No. 28 ) and their response to the petitioner's motion for leave to conduct discovery (ECF No. [33). In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered October 2, 2017 (ECF No. 8 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time ECF No. 30 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; petitioner to response to the motion to dismiss ECF No. 28 is extended to 11/29/2018; in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order ECF No. 8 will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Petition (ECF No. 19 ) is GRANTED. Clerk shall separately file petitioner's Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, which is currently on file at ECF No. [ 19]-1. Answer/response to petition due by 8/17/2018. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal (ECF No. 20 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner is granted leave of court to file his Exhibit Number 33 under seal. As that exhibit has already been filed under seal (ECF No. 21 ), no further action is necessary in this regard. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that respondents' response to the first amended petition will be suspended, pending the resolution of the motions filed by the petitioner on 5/18/2018; the Court will set a new schedule when said motions are resolved. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting ECF No. 11 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to file an amended petition. Amended Petition due by 4/2/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Petitioner to pay $5 filing fee within 20 days. Amended petition due within 90 days, answer due within 60 days thereafter, reply due within 45 days of response, and response to reply due within 30 days thereafter. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that petitioners Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ECF No. 1 isDENIED;Clerk to separately file the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ECF No. 1 -1 and the Motion for Appointment of Counsel ECF No. 1 -2; petitioners Motion f or Appointment of Counsel is GRANTED; the Federal Public Defender for the District of Nevada (FPD) is appointed to represent petitioner; if the FPD is unable to represent the petitioner, due to a conflict of interest or other reason, then alte rnate counsel will be appointed; the Clerk shall electronically serve upon the FPD a copy of this order, together with a copy of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (e-served on 08/31/2017); FPD shall have until 09/30/2017to file a notice of appearance, or to indicate to the Court its inability to represent the petitioner in this case; the court will set a new deadline for payment of the filing fee after counsel appear for the petitioner and the respondents; the Clerk to add Adam Paul Laxalt, AG, as counsel for respondents; Clerk to electronically serve upon respondents a copy of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and a copy of this order (e-served on 08/31/2017); respondents shall have 30 days from the date on which the pet ition is served upon them to appear in this action; respondents will not be required to respond to the habeas petition at this time; the court will establish a schedule for furtherproceedings in this case after counsel appear for the petitioner and the respondents. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 08/31/2017. (copy of order sent to P) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marco Guzman
Represented By: Rene Valladares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Represented By: Heather D. Procter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada, State of
Represented By: Heather D. Procter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?