Geo-Logic Associates, Inc. v. Metal Recovery Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Geo-Logic Associates, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Metal Recovery Solutions, Inc. and Thom Seal |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00563 |
Filed: |
September 13, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Cobb |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
18 U.S.C. § 1836 (b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 17, 2020 |
Filing
98
ORDER - The previously filed motion for writ of execution and motion for writ of garnishment (ECF Nos. 91 , 92 ) are DENIED AS MOOT as amended motions have been filed at ECF Nos. 96 , 97 . In addition, the motion to file a redacted versi on of the supplement to the motions (ECF No. 94 ) is GRANTED as good cause exists to redact the limited confidential information contained in the supplement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 9, 2020 |
Filing
90
ORDER granting ECF No. 89 Stipulation regarding the post-judgment interest rate. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
March 4, 2020 |
Filing
88
ORDER that the motion for writ of execution (ECF No. 86 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff shall FILE a new writ of execution (on the court's form) as well as a new writ of garnishment, correcting the deficiencies noted above as to both within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
February 13, 2020 |
Filing
84
IT IS therefore ordered that Defendant Metal Recovery Solutions, Inc.'s emergency motion to stay execution of judgment pending appeal 59 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the various motions to seal 60 66 76 80 are granted. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/13/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - WJ)
|
January 6, 2020 |
Filing
57
ORDER granting ECF No. 25 Motion for Judgment, except on GLA's request for attorneys' fees and to recover expenses; directing the Clerk to enter judgment as specified herein; denying ECF No. 30 Motion to Vacate; and granting ECF No. 29 Motion to Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
October 7, 2019 |
Filing
28
ORDER granting ECF No. 27 Motion to Substitute Attorneys Michael D. Rounds and Adam K. Yowell in for Attorney Marie M. Kerr on behalf of Defendants Metal Recovery Solutions, Inc., Thom Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
September 25, 2018 |
Filing
24
ORDER approving ECF No. 23 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Sayuri Espinosa on behalf of Geo-Logic Associates, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Louis M. Bubala, III. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/25/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?