King v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: |
Matthew J. King |
Defendant: |
Connie Bisbee, Nevada Board of Parole Commissioners and State of Nevada |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00606 |
Filed: |
October 2, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Cobb |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 1, 2019 |
Filing
30
ORDER - Plaintiff's objection (ECF No. 26 ) is overruled. The Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 25 ) is accepted and adopted in its entirety. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint (ECF No. 22 ) is denied. This case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 28, 2019 |
Filing
19
ORDER DENYING without prejudice ECF No. 16 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days within which to submit a motion to amend, accompanied by a proposed Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 26, 2019 |
Filing
18
ORDER that Plaintiff's IFP application (ECF No. 1 ) is GRANTED; NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account; Clerk directed to send a copy of this order to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services (E-service to Finance and mailed to NDOC C hief on 2/26/2019); Clerk directed to e-serve NV AG with a copy of this order and a copy of ECF No. 6 Plaintiff's first amended complaint (E-service and NEF regenerated on 2/26/2019); service must be perfected by 5/27/2019; AG to a dvise Court by 3/19/2019 re acceptance of service and/or provide last-known-address information under seal; plaintiff to file a motion identifying the unserved defendant(s), requesting issuance of a summons, and specifying a full name and addr ess for the defendant(s); answer/response due within 60 days for any defendants represented; Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service; this case is no longer stayed. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?