Arpino v. Nevada Supreme Court et al
Plaintiff: |
John Francis Arpino |
Defendant: |
Nevada Court of Appeals and Nevada Supreme Court |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00608 |
Filed: |
October 3, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Valerie P. Cooke |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 16, 2018 |
Filing
22
ORDER that this case is dismissed without prejudice; Clerk directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
April 10, 2018 |
Filing
15
ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's R&R (ECF No. 10 ) is accepted and adopted in full; Plaintiff's objection (ECF No. 12 ) is overruled; Plaintiff's IFP application (ECF No. 1 ) is denied; this action will be dism issed without prejudice unless Plaintiff pays the $400 filing fee by 5/10/2018; Clerk directed to send Plaintiff two copies of this order (attached hereto for distribution to Plaintiff via NNCC Law Library); Clerk directed to retain the Complaint (ECF Nos. 1 -1, 1 -2). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 2nd copy of order)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
February 16, 2018 |
Filing
10
SCREENING ORDER that plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. 1 is DENIED; petition of writ of mandamus ECF No. 1 -1 at 4-9 be DENIED; action will be dismissed without prejudice unless plaintiff pays $400.00 filing fee in full by 03/18/2018; Clerk directed to send plaintiff (2) copies of this order (attached hereto and sent via NNCC Law Library); plaintiff to make the necessary arrangement to have one copy of order attached to the check paying the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/16/2018. (Attachments: # 1 2nd Copy of Order)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?