Palmer v. State of Nevada et al
Petitioner: Kenneth Palmer
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General and Nevada, State of
Case Number: 3:2017cv00644
Filed: October 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED that this petition is DISMISSED as set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that respondents' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 11 ) is GRANTED; Petitioner shall have until 3/8/2019 to respond as outlined in order; if Petitioner elects to abandon his unexhausted ground, Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of service to file an answer; Petitioner shall have 30 days following service of Respondents' answer in which to file a reply; if Petitioner fails to respond to this order within the time permitted, this case may be dismissed; responden ts' first and second motions for extension of time to file a response to the petition (ECF Nos. 9 , 10 ) are both GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Clerk directed to file and e-serve the petition ECF No. 1 -1 on the respondents (e-served 12/6/17); Clerk directed to add NV AG as counsel for respondents; respondents to file a response to the petition by 3/6/18; petitione r shall have 45 days from service of the answer, motion to dismiss, or other response to file a reply or opposition; any additional state court record exhibits filed herein; the parties SHALL SEND courtesy copies of all exhibits in this case to Reno Staff Attorney. See Order for further details and instructions. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the above-entitled action is hereby transferred to the unofficial northern division of this Court for all further proceedings. The Clerk of Court shall transfer and reopen this matter as a new action under a new docket number in the northern division, and the present action under the present docket number shall be closed. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?