Eyetalk365, LLC v. Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited
Plaintiff: Eyetalk365, LLC
Defendant: Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited
Case Number: 3:2017cv00686
Filed: November 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice pursuant to ECF No. 151 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER that the parties shall have until April 18, 2019, to either file a stipulation to dismiss with prejudice, or a joint status report indicating when the stipulation will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting ECF No. 145 / 147 Stipulation to Stay All Deadlines Pending Resolution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 2/25/2019 to fix hyperlink (DRM).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting ECF No. 128 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply in Support of ECF No. 125 Motion for Reconsideration. Response due by 12/21/2018. Reply due by 12/28/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting ECF No. 106 Stipulation to Extend re ECF No. 103 Motion to Compel (First Request): Defendants' response due by 11/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER that ECF No. 83 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re ECF No. 84 Motion to Seal. The Sealed Exhibit (ECF No. 85 ), in Case No. 3:17-cv-00686, and Sealed Exhibit (ECF No. 179), in Case No. 2:17-cv-02714, referenced in Zmodos motions shall remain under seal until August 23, 2018. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting ECF No. 75 Defendant Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited's Motion to Extend Time to File Response to ECF No. 67 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify. (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting ECF No. 48 Motion to Substitute Attorney Chad R. Fears in for Attorney Richard G. Campbell on behalf of Zmodo Technology Corporation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/29/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER approving ECF No. 42 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Marcus A. Barber on behalf of Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited and approving Designation of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears. Signed by Judge Robe rt C. Jones on 6/28/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting ECF No. 37 Motion to Substitute Attorney Richard G. Campbell, Jr. in for Attorney Melanie D. Morgan on behalf of Defendant Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re Notice (ECF No. 105 in Case 2:17-cv-02714)) to remove Attorney Edward Cole from CM/ECF Notice List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SCHEDULING A PRE-CLAIM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for 5/17/2018 at 1:30 PM in LV Chambers Rm 3071 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Confidential settlement statements due by 5/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REASSIGNMENT ORDER that Case No. 3:17-cv-00686-MMD-WGC is reassigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, and all future pleadings must bear case number 3:17-cv-00686-RCJ-PAL. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eyetalk365, LLC v. Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eyetalk365, LLC
Represented By: Tim Craddock
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Gary R. Sorden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?