April 8, 2020 |
Filing
151
ORDER granting ECF No. 150 Stipulation of Dismissal. Nationstar's claims against Curti Ranch Two Maintenance Association are dismissed, with prejudice, subject to the confidential terms of the settlement agreement between them. Each party to the stipulation to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
December 16, 2019 |
Filing
136
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - Defendant's Oral Motion to Reconsider (ECF No. 131 ), SFR's Motion in Limine (ECF No. 88 ), Motion for Judicial Notice (ECF No. 128 ), and Defendant's Supplemental Trial Brief/Motion to Dis miss (ECF No. 130 ) are DENIED. Nationstar's Motion in Limine (ECF No. 89 ) is DENIED as moot. See image for additional details. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
November 4, 2019 |
Filing
134
ORDER approving ECF No. 132 Stipulation re ECF No. 130 Trial Brief. Nationstar's response due by 11/8/2019. SFR's reply due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
October 15, 2019 |
Filing
118
ORDER that Nationstar's motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 105 ) is DENIED without prejudice; the court GRANTS the parties stipulation for extension of time regarding pretrial related submissions (ECF No. 114 ) to October 17,2019, as agreed. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
September 26, 2019 |
Filing
107
ORDER - Defendants Curti Ranch and SFR have until 10/11/2019 to file a response to Nationstar's motion to reconsider (ECF No. 105 ). Following defendants' response, Nationstar will hsve 3 days to file a reply. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
September 24, 2019 |
Filing
99
ORDER granting Defendant Curti Ranch Two Maintenance Association's ECF No. 91 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Calendar Call. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 22, 2019 |
Filing
81
ORDER granting ECF No. 80 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 8/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 5, 2019 |
Filing
78
ORDER referring case to The Honorable Carla Baldwin Carry for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
April 26, 2019 |
Filing
71
ORDER granting ECF No. 70 Stipulation : Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 4/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 25, 2019 |
Filing
62
ORDER that the parties shall submit their proposed joint pretrial order pursuant to Local Rules 16-3 and 16-4 by 4/26/2019. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
January 30, 2019 |
Filing
59
ORDER that defendant SFR's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 31 ) is DENIED; plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 37 ) is DENIED; defendant SFR's counter motion for relief pursuant to Rule 56(d) (ECF No. 39 ) is DENIED; plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 45 ) is DENIED; and defendant SFR's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 46 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
October 17, 2018 |
Filing
56
ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ECF No. 55 Stipulation to Extend re ECF No. 46 Motion for Summary Judgment: SFR's reply due by 10/23/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
September 17, 2018 |
Filing
50
ORDER granting ECF No. 49 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Responses to ECF Nos. 45 and 46 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 10/2/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
April 2, 2018 |
Filing
30
ORDERED that SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's demand for security costs (ECF No. 8 ) is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Curti Ranch Two Maintenance Association, Inc.'s motion to dismiss (ECF No. 6 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The court dismisses claim two (breach of NRS 116.1113) and claim three (wrongful foreclosure). The court does not dismiss claim one. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 1, 2018 |
Filing
25
ORDER granting ECF No. 24 SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC's Motion to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference scheduled for 3/2/2018 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 3/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
February 28, 2018 |
Filing
22
ORDER granting ECF No. 20 Motion for Curti Ranch Two Maintenance Association to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
February 27, 2018 |
Filing
21
ORDER granting ECF No. 19 Motion for Donna M. Wittig, Esq. to Appear Telephonically at Case Managememnt Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|