Garmong v. Lyon County, Nevada et al

Plaintiff: Gregory O Garmong
Defendant: Michael P Boudreau, Epic Wireless, Andrew Lesa, Lyon County Board of Commissioners, Lyon, County of, Sacramento Valley Limited Partnership dba Verizon Wireless and Smith Valley Fire Protection District
Case Number: 3:2017cv00701
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2018 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 53 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply to ECF No. 52 Response to ECF No. 35 Motion to Dismiss. Reply due by 6/29/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 17, 2018 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 48 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 45 Motion to Strike due by 5/25/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 16, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving ECF No. 23 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Keola Robert Whittaker on behalf of defendants Epic Wireless, Andrew Lesa, Sacramento Valley Limited Partnership dba Verizon Wireless and approving De signation of Local Counsel Matthew Addison. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/16/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 19, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 19 Stipulation for Extension of Time to respond to ECF No. 12 Smith Valley Fire Protection District and Michael P. Boudreau's Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 3/23/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 14, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 16 Stipulation : Lyon County Board of Commissionera' and Lyon County's answer to ECF No. 1 Compalint due by 3/21/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garmong v. Lyon County, Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P Boudreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyon County Board of Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyon, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento Valley Limited Partnership dba Verizon Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Valley Fire Protection District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory O Garmong
Represented By: Carl M. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?