Bluehorse v. City of Reno, Nevada et al

Plaintiff: Akenaten Bluehorse
Defendant: Chuck Allen, Naphcare, Inc., Reno, City of and Washoe, County of
Case Number: 3:2017cv00702
Filed: December 4, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this action is dismissed without prejudice; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 16, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 11 Motion to file documents electronically. (See order for specifics.) Furthermore, Plaintiff's ECF No. 13 Motion to Stay Case is GRANTED in part : Plaintiff shall have to and including August 14, 2018 to properly serve the complaint on the defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 12, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that ECF Nos. 1 -2 motion for preliminary injunction, 5 application to proceed in forma pauperis and 7 application to proceed in forma pauperis are denied as moot; ECF No. 7 request for reimbursement of filing is denied; and ECF No. 8 motion for permission to e-file is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 7, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that ECF No. 1 Application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice; Clerk directed to send instructions and approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner (mailed to P on 12/7/17); IFP or filing fee ($400) due by 1/6/18; failure to comply may result in dismissal of this action; Clerk directed to retain but not file ECF No. 1 - 1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bluehorse v. City of Reno, Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reno, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washoe, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akenaten Bluehorse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?