Fleming v. Brown

Plaintiff: Richard M. Fleming
Defendant: Chad A. Brown
202) 403-3030 (fax: Lisa Ann Dunner and Adam William Sikich
Case Number: 3:2017cv00707
Filed: December 5, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2018 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that ECF No. 49 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings is granted; ECF No. 53 Defendant's Motion to Strike is granted; Clerk directed to strike ECF No. 52 Reply; this case is stayed pending arbitration; Clerk directed to administratively close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 13, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re ECF No. 41 Order on ECF No. 34 Motion. Plaintiff shall contact the CM/ECF Help Desk at (702) 464-5555 to set up a CM/ECF account. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 11, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 32 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney John D. Tennert substituted in place of Lisa Ann Dunner and Adam William Sikich for Defendant Chad A. Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad A. Brown
Represented By: John D. Tennert
Represented By: Douglas R Thornley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
202) 403-3030 (fax: Lisa Ann Dunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
202) 403-3030 (fax: Adam William Sikich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard M. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?