Hermanson v. Baca et al

Petitioner: James E. Hermanson
Respondent: Isidro Baca and Nevada Attorney General
Unknown: Adam P. Laxalt
Case Number: 3:2017cv00721
Filed: December 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting ECF No. 39 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time re file reply to ECF No. 31 Motion to Dismiss. Petitioner's Reply due by 3/14/2019. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting ECF No. 35 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 31 Motion to Dismiss due by 2/6/2019. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting ECF No. 29 Motion for Enlargement of Time to file a response to ECF No. 21 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Respondents' response/answer due 12/26/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting ECF No. 27 Motion for Enlargement of Time to respond to ECF No. 21 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondent's response/answer due 12/20/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting ECF No. 25 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to respond to ECF No. 21 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents' response/answer due 12/6/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that ECF No. 23 Respondents' unopposed motion for an extension of time to file a response to ECF No. 21 petitioner's second amended petition for writ of habeas corpus is granted. Response/answer due by 10/22/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that petitioner's motion for leave to file second amended petition ECF No. 19 and motion for leave to file Exhibits 52 and 53 under to seal ECF No. 18 are GRANTED; petitioner shall have up to and including 7/9/2018 to file second amended petition; respondents not required to respond to the first amended petition. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 3/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that FPD through Jonathan M Kirshbaum is appointed as counsel for petitioner; amended petition due by 5/25/2018; Respondents' answer/response due within 60 days of service of an amended petition; petitioner may reply within < b>30 days from service of answer/response; any additional state court record exhibits filed herein; the parties must send hard copies of all exhibits in this case to Reno Clerk's Office. See Order for further details and instructions. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the Petitions for Writ of Mandamus ECF Nos. 6 / 9 are DENIED without prejudice; Clerk directed to SEND petitioner an additional copy of this order with a copy of the two Petitions for Writ of Mandamus (mailed on 01/18/2018). Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting ECF No. 7 Motion to Extend Time. FPD to enter a notice of appearance by 2/2/2018. No additional extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Petitioners IFP application ECF No. 1 is granted; Clerk directed to file ECF No. 1 -1 Petition; FPD appointed as counsel for petitioner; FPD notice of appearance due 1/14/18; Clerk directed to add NV AG as counsel for r espondents; Respondents' notice of appearance due 1/5/18; Clerk directed to send a copy of this order to petitioner, AG, FPD, and CJA Coordinator (e-service and hard copy on P on 12/15/17); Clerk directed to send all prior filings to AG and FPD (NEF nos. 1-2 regenerated 12/15/17). Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) Modified on 12/15/2017 to clarify service(LH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hermanson v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Isidro Baca
Represented By: Jeffrey M Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Jeffrey M Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James E. Hermanson
Represented By: Megan Hoffman
Represented By: Rene Valladares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?