Sonoma Springs Limited Partnership et al v. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland et al

Plaintiff: Sonoma Springs Associates, LLC and Sonoma Springs Limited Partnership
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois
Case Number: 3:2018cv00021
Filed: January 16, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2018 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendants' motion to stay this matter (ECF No. 30 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 12, 2018 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 49 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No. 47 Response re ECF No. 30 Motion to Stay Case due by 6/15/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 8, 2018 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Amended Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 14, 2018 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 44 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File an Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Case (ECF No. 30 ). Response/Opposition due by 6/4/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonoma Springs Limited Partnership et al v. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Steven W Beckstrom
Represented By: Erik R. Hamblin
Represented By: Ryan William Leary
Represented By: Jason W Peak
Represented By: David W Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Steven W Beckstrom
Represented By: Erik R. Hamblin
Represented By: Ryan William Leary
Represented By: Jason W Peak
Represented By: David W Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonoma Springs Associates, LLC
Represented By: Audrey Damonte
Represented By: James W Puzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonoma Springs Limited Partnership
Represented By: Audrey Damonte
Represented By: James W Puzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?