Rimer v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Stanley Rimer
Respondent: Renee Baker, Nevada Attorney General, Nevada, State of and Brian Sandoval
Case Number: 3:2018cv00023
Filed: January 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting ECF No. 58 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents will have up to and including June 4, 2021, to file an answer to the First Amended Petition (ECF No. 17 ). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER - Respondents' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 27 ) is denied. The Court holds that Ground 1 is actually unexhausted, but is technically exhausted because it would be procedurally barred by the state courts. The Court defers con sideration of whether Petitioner can demonstrate cause and prejudice under Martinez v. Ryan, 566 U.S. 1 (2012), to overcome the procedural default of Ground 1 until after the filing of an answer and reply in this action. Within 45 days of entry of this order, Respondents must file an answer addressing all claims in the Amended Petition (ECF No. 17 ) on the merits, under a de novo standard of review as to Ground 1, and also addressing whether Ground 1 is barred by procedural default under federal law. Petitioner shall have 45 days from service of the answer within which to file a reply. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting ECF No. 54 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents will have up to and including January 22, 2021, to file a reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 27 ). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting Respondents' ECF No. 52 Motion to Extend Time re ECF No. 27 Motion to Dismiss. Reply due by 1/19/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting ECF No. 50 Motion to Extend Time : Reply to ECF No. 43 Response re ECF No. 27 Motion to Dismiss due by 1/4/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER - Respondents' unopposed motion for enlargement of time (ECF No. 48 ) is granted. Respondents will have up to and including December 4, 2020, to file a reply in support of their motion to dismiss. (ECF No. 27 .) on 11/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting ECF No. 46 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents will have up to and including November 4, 2020, to file a reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 27 ). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting ECF No. 44 Motion to Extend Time : Reply to ECF No. 43 Response re ECF No. 27 Motion to Dismiss due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that Petitioner's unopposed motion for extension of time (first request) (ECF No. 40 ) is granted. Petitioner will have up to and including July 15, 2020, to file a response to the motion to dismiss (ECF No. 27 ). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting ECF No. 23 Motion to Extend Time : Answer/response to ECF No. 17 First Amended Petition due by 1/16/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - Answer/response to ECF No. 17 First Amended Petition due by 11/30/2019; reply due 45 days after service of answer. If Rs file a motion, P will have 45 days to respond; and Rs Reply due 21 days after service of response. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting ECF No. 14 Unopposed motion for extension of time (second request). Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that Petitioner's unopposed motion for extension of time (first request) (ECF No. 12 ) is granted. Petitioner will have through March 16, 2019, to file an amended petition. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Clerk file the petition; Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. 6 ) is granted and his duplicative motions for a copy of his petition (ECF Nos. 5 , 7 ) are denied as moot; FPD is provisionally app ointed to represent petitioner; FPD notice of appearance due by 7/19/2018; Clerk directed to add NV AG as counsel for respondents; Clerk directed to electronically serve NV AG and FPD a copy of the petition and a copy of this order (E-service on 6/19/2018); Respondents' notice of appearance due by 7/9/2018; paper copies of any electronically filed exhibits need not be provided to chambers or to the staff attorney, unless later directed by the Court. See Order for further details and instructions. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying ECF No. 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; payment of $5.00 filing fees due 2/17/2018; Clerk directed to send petitioner (2) copies of this order; petitioner to make arrangement to have (1) copy of this order attached to the check paying the filing fee. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rimer v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanley Rimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?