August 5, 2020 |
Filing
45
ORDER - The Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. Respondents' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 27 ) is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice because it is untimely. Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
June 30, 2020 |
Filing
43
ORDER that Respondents' unopposed motion for enlargement of time (ECF No. 42 ) is granted. Respondents will have up to and including July 13, 2020, to file a reply to the opposition to the motion to dismiss (ECF No. 38 ). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
June 1, 2020 |
Filing
40
ORDER granting 39 ECF No. Motion to Extend Time : Reply to ECF No. 38 Response re ECF No. 27 Motion to Dismiss due by 6/29/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 27, 2020 |
Filing
37
ORDER granting ECF No. 36 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner will have through May 8, 2020, to file a response to the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 27 ). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
February 4, 2020 |
Filing
34
ORDER granting ECF No. 33 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 27 Motion to Dismiss due by 3/25/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 4, 2019 |
Filing
32
ORDER granting ECF No. 31 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 27 Motion to Dismiss due by 2/5/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
June 27, 2019 |
Filing
24
ORDER that the Respondents are to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Petition (ECF No. 21 ) by 8/26/2019; petitioner will have 45 days from service of the answer, motion to dismiss, or other response to file a reply or opposition. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
June 4, 2019 |
Filing
23
ORDER that Petitioner's motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 20 ) is granted nunc pro tunc, in connection with the first amended petition filed on May 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
April 3, 2019 |
Filing
18
ORDER granting ECF No. 17 Unopposed motion for extension of time (third request). Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus due by 5/24/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
January 28, 2019 |
Filing
16
ORDER granting ECF No. 15 Petitioner's motion for an extension of time to file an amended petition. Amended Petition due by 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
October 2, 2018 |
Filing
14
ORDER granting ECF No. 13 Motion for Extension of Time. Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus due by 1/22/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
June 25, 2018 |
Filing
8
ORDER - ECF No. 6 IFP application granted. Clerk shall file the petition. ECF No. 7 Motion for counsel is granted. FPD is provisionally appointed to represent Petitioner. FPD shall undertake direct representation of Petitione r or to indicate to the Court his inability to represent Petitioner by 7/25/2018. Clerk shall add AG as counsel for Respondents. Clerk shall e-serve both AG and FPD a copy of the petition and a copy of this Order. (E-service on 6/25/2018; copy of Ord er mailed tp P at LCC) AG must enter a notice of appearance by 7/15/2018, but no further response will be required from Respondents until further order of the Court. Paper copies of any electronically filed exhibits need not be provided to chambers or to the staff attorney, unless later directed by the Court. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 6, 2018 |
Filing
5
ORDER granting ECF No. 4 Petitioner's motion for extension of time to file IFP application. Petitioner will have until 5/7/2018 to comply with ECF No. 3 Order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
February 6, 2018 |
Filing
3
ORDER directing the Clerk to send petitioner an IFP application form for inmates (mailed on 02/06/2018); petitioner to file an application for IFP, accompanied by a signed financial certificate and a statement of his inmate account or pay the filing fee of $5.00 attaching a copy of this order with payment by 3/8/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|