Wetzel v. Baca et al

Petitioner: Gary Wetzel
Respondent: Isidro Baca and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2018cv00114
Filed: March 13, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that ECF No. 11 Respondents' motion for enlargement of time to file a response to ECF No. 8 Petition (first request) is granted; Answer/response due by 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 22, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Clerk file the petition (ECF No. 1 -1) and the motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. 1 -2); the motion for appointment of counsel is denied; Clerk directed to add NV AG as counsel for Respondents and electronically serve upon them a copy of the petition and a copy of this order (E-service on 6/22/2018); Clerk instructed to return a copy of the petition to the Petitioner (mailed to P on 6/22/2018); respondents to file a response to the petition by 8/6/2018; paper c opies of any electronically filed exhibits need not be provided to chambers or to the staff attorney, unless later directed by the Court. See Order for further details and instructions. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 27, 2018 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's motion for enlargement of time to pay the filing fee (ECF No. 4 ) is granted; $5 filing fee due by 5/21/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 19, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying ECF No. 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; petitioner to pay filing fee of $5.00 by 4/18/2018; failure to comply will result in dismissal of action; Clerk directed to send petitioner (2) copies of order; petitioner to make the necessary arrangements to have one copy of order attached to the check paying filing fee. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wetzel v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?