October 30, 2019 |
Filing
55
ORDER that Petitioner's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing (ECF No. 35 ), Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. 38 ), Motion for Meeting (ECF No. 45 ), Motion for Federal Judicial Action (ECF No. 50 ), and Motion to Stop Transfer to Las Vegas (ECF No. 52 ) are denied. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
June 19, 2019 |
Filing
43
ORDER that Petitioner's motion for extension of time (ECF No. 41 ) is granted; Petitioner will have until June 30, 2019, to file his reply to Respondents' opposition to Petitioner's motion for reconsideration; Petitioner's request to extend his copy work account limit (ECF No. 42 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
March 19, 2019 |
Filing
37
ORDER that construes Petitioner's motion (ECF No. 35 ), filed 26 days after entry of judgment, as a motion for relief under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e). Petitioner will have until 4/18/2019 to supplement his motion to address the legal standar d for seeking relief under Rule 59(e). Respondents must respond within 30 days of the filing of a supplement or the expiration of the time to do so. Petitioner will have 30 days from the filing of any response to file any reply. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
February 14, 2019 |
Filing
32
ORDER - Respondents' motion to dismiss the petition as untimely (ECF No. 14 ) is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Petitioner's motion for leave to file a sur-reply (ECF No. 30 ) is denied. Petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability. Clerk shall enter final judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
September 26, 2018 |
Filing
27
ORDER that Petitioner's motion for production of transcripts (ECF No. 22 ) is denied without prejudice; and Petitioner's "motion to oppose respondents' opposition" (ECF No. 24 ), construed as a reply, is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
September 14, 2018 |
Filing
26
ORDER granting ECF No. 25 Petitioner's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to file response to ECF No. 14 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 11/2/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
July 26, 2018 |
Filing
21
ORDER granting ECF No. 19 Motion for Extension of Time to file response to ECF No. 14 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 9/17/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
June 6, 2018 |
Filing
13
ORDER that the Clerk of Court strike Mr. Fasthorse's letter (ECF No. 12 ) from the docket. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
May 23, 2018 |
Filing
11
ORDER - Respondents' motion for enlargement of time (ECF No. 10 ) is granted. Respondents will have until July 6, 2018, to respond to the petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. 5 ). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
April 12, 2018 |
Filing
8
ORDER denying Petitioner's ECF No. 7 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
March 23, 2018 |
Filing
4
ORDER that petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. 1 is granted; Clerk directed to file the petition for a writ of habeas corpus ECF No. 1 -1; Clerk directed to electronically serve the AG with a copy of the petition a nd this order along with regenerated NEF of remaining filings (e-service and NEF regenerated on 3/23/2018); respondents will have until 05/22/2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the petition; any exhibits filed by the parties must be filed with a separate index of exhibits identifying the exhibits by number or letter; hard copy of any additional state court record exhibits must be forwarded for this case to the Reno Clerks Office; petitioner will have (30) days from service of the an swer, motion to dismiss or other response to mail a reply or response to the Clerk for filing. See Order for specific details and information. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
March 13, 2018 |
Filing
3
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the above-entitled action is hereby transferred to the unofficial northern division of this Court for all further proceedings. The Clerk of Court shall transfer and reopen this matter as a new action under a new docket number in the northern division, and the present action under the present docket number shall be closed. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|