Kelsey v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Zachary Kelsey
Respondent: Renee Baker, James Dzurenda and Adam Laxalt
Unknown: Adam P. Laxalt
Case Number: 3:2018cv00174
Filed: April 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re ECF No. 38 USCA Order : Clerk of Court shall reopen this action. Within seven (7) days (7/22/2021), Kimberly Sandberg shall file a notice of appearance. Within seven (7) days (7/22/2021), the Respondents shall file the depositi on testimony of John Ohlson and the expert report as supplemental exhibits. Within forty-five (45) days (8/29/2021), Kelsey shall file supplemental briefing addressing the sole issue upon which the Ninth Circuit granted a certificate of a ppealability. Respondents shall respond to Kelsey's briefing within forty-five (45) days after being served with that briefing. Kelsey may then file a reply within thirty (30) days of the response. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. 6 ) is denied; Petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability; Clerk directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying ECF No. 22 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; Petitioner to file a reply to ECF No. 16 Answer to Habeas Petition by 12/20/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED that ECF No. 14 Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to ECF No. 6 habeas corpus petition is granted; Respondents answer/response due by 9/4/2018; and in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered May 16, 2018 (ECF No. 5 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that ECF No. 11 Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time to respond to ECF No. 6 habeas corpus petition is granted; response/answer due by 8/30/2018; in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the Order entered May 16, 2018 (ECF No. 5 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Clerk directed to separately file the habeas petition (ECF No. 1 -1) and the motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. 1 -2); Clerk directed to add the NV AG as counsel for respondents and electronically serve a copy of the petition and a copy of this order (e-service on 5/17/2018); respondents notice of appearance and answer/response to the petition due by 7/16/2018; petitioner will have 60 days from service of the answer, motion to dismiss, or other response to file a reply or opposition; petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that petitioner's IFP application (ECF No. 1 ) is denied; $5 filing fee due by 6/11/2018; failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of this action; if Kelsey is unable to pay the filing fee, he may file a new IFP application; Clerk directed to send petitioner 2 copies of this order (mailed to petitioner on 4/27/2018). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelsey v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Represented By: Amanda C Sage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Dzurenda
Represented By: Amanda C Sage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Adam Laxalt
Represented By: Amanda C Sage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zachary Kelsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?