McKnight v. Tesla Motors Inc

Plaintiff: Terria McKnight
Defendant: Tesla Motors Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv00220
Filed: May 14, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER re ECF No. 14 USCA Referral Notice re ECF No. 11 Notice of Appeal, certifying that any in forma pauperis appeal from the order of dismissal would be frivolous or would not be taken in good faith. Plaintiff's IFP status should be revoked on appeal. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF and also sent to USCA 9th Circuit - KR)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER that the R&R (ECF No. 7 ) is accepted and adopted in its entirety; Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. 6 ) is dismissed with prejudice; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER - ECF No. 1 IFP Application is GRANTED. Clerk shall FILE the complaint (ECF No. 1 -1). The complaint is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. "Amended Complaint" due by 6/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKnight v. Tesla Motors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terria McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Motors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?