Tesla, Inc. v. Tripp
Plaintiff: Tesla, Inc.
Defendant: Martin Tripp
Case Number: 3:2018cv00296
Filed: June 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER: The video status conference currently set before this Court on 10/21/2020 at 8:00 AM is VACATED. Pursuant to the District Court's order 218 , this Court will set a settlement conference utilizing Zoom video conferencing technology. The Court is currently available to conduct the settlement conference on any of the following dates: November 25, November 30, December 14, December 18, or December 23, 2020 all to commence at 8:00 a.m. The parties shall have until Monday, October 2 6, 2020 to advise the deputy court clerk of the date that works best with their calendars for this settlement conference. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 10/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER - Plaintiff shall file a certificate of service evidencing proof of service on the plaintiff defendant by no later than 5:00 p.m. PST on Wednesday, October 15, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 10/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW) Modified on 10/13/2020 (DN). Modified on 10/13/2020 (DN). (Main Document 224 replaced on 10/13/2020) (LE).
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER - The court has reviewed Tesla's emergency motion for order to show cause (ECF No. 220 ) and finds that the "emergency" motion is not, in fact, an emergency. Thus the normal briefing schedule as outlined in Local Rule 7-2(b) will apply. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER - Tripp's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 154 ) is granted in part, and denied in part, as specified herein. Tesla's Motion for Summary Judgment on Tripp's Counterclaims (ECF Nos. 155 , 162 (sealed)) is grante d. Tesla's Motions to Seal (ECF Nos. 161 , 183 , 195 ) are granted. Tripp's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply (ECF No. 197 ) is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting ECF No. 190 Stipulation. The Parties shall have until June 9, 2020 to file their respective replies to the Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 154 , 155 ). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/26/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting ECF No. 188 Stipulation : Replies to ECF Nos. 177 , 178 Responses re ECF Nos. 154 , 155 Motions for Summary Judgment due by 6/2/2020. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting ECF No. 168 Stipulation to Extend Time re ECF Nos. 154 and 155 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 5/5/2020. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting ECF No. 150 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Fletcher R. Carpenter withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting ECF No. 144 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 1/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER approving ECF No. 137 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jeanine M. Zalduendo on behalf of Tesla, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Rory T. Kay. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/14/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting ECF No. 110 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule on Motion to Compel Elon Musk Deposition (Second Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting ECF No. 106 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule on Motion to Compel Elon Musk Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 10/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting ECF No. 94 Motion to Substitute Attorney Charis Lex P.C. and Jackson Lewis P.C. in for Attorney Hueston Hennigan, LLP on behalf of Tesla, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 9/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER approving ECF No. 84 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Fletcher R. Carpenter on behalf of Martin Tripp and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jason C. Kolbe. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/15/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting ECF No. 78 Motion to Withdraw Christopher J. Waznik as Counsel of Record and Approve Change of Counsel of Record Within Law Firm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 6/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER approving ECF No. 74 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Douglas J. Beteta on behalf of Tesla, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Joshua A. Sliker. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/ 4/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting ECF No. 60 Stipulation for Court Order Directing Google LLC to Produce Certain Communications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 1/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting ECF No. 46 Stipulation of Substitution of Local Counsel Within Same Firm and Designation of Resident Attorney Admitted to the Bar of This Court and Consent Thereto. Attorneys Jason C. Kolbe and Kevin S. Soderstrom in place and stead of Matthew D. Dayton on behalf of Defendant/Counterdefendant/Counterclaimant Martin Tripp. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/24/2018.; (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER approving ECF No. 41 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen Richards on behalf of plaintiff Tesla, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Joshua A Sliker. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/12/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Material granting ECF No. 43 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 10/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER approving ECF No. 21 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Marshall A. Camp on behalf of plaintiff Tesla, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Joshua A. Sliker. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/13/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER approving ECF No. 17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Allison L. Libeu on behalf of plaintiff Tesla, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Joshua A. Sliker. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks o n 7/12/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting ECF No. 13 Stipulation regarding extension of time and discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting ECF No. 11 Plaintiff Tesla, Inc.'s Second Emergency Motion for Authorization to Issue Document Preservation Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting ECF No. 8 Plaintiff Tesla, Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Authorization to Issue Document Preservation Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tesla, Inc. v. Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesla, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall A. Camp
Represented By: John C. Hueston
Represented By: Robert N. Klieger
Represented By: Allison Lauren Libeu
Represented By: Joshua A Sliker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?