Merkelbach v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Jean Merkelbach
Defendant: Does 1-10, Internal Revenue Service, United States of America, Department of the Treasury and Chad Smittkamp
Case Number: 3:2018cv00436
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Jean Merkelbach. (Simons, Mark)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (ECF No. #6 ) is granted. The IRS Liens are expunged. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of United States' Disclaimer of Interest In Real Property by United States of America. (Lowe, Virginia)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/25/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff Jean Merkelbach's motion for preliminary injunction (ECF No. #6 ) and motion for temporary restraining order (ECF No. #4 ). Although Plaintiff has requested an "expedited hearing date," Plaintiff has failed to comply with LR 7-4, which sets forth certain requirements for emergency consideration of motions. For example, Plaintiff has not submitted a statement indicating that she has participated in the meet-and-confer process to resolve the dispute. Moreover, Plaintiff has failed to show that she made diligent efforts to prevent this situation from requiring emergency judicial assistance. Accordingly, to the extent that Plaintiff's motions request emergency relief, that request is denied. The normal briefing schedule will apply to these motions, and the Court will consider them in due course. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/25/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:18-cv-436-MMD-CBC. (no image attached) (BLG)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Robert C. Jones, Senior District Judge on 9/25/2018, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Robert C. Jones, Senior District Judge recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. IT IS SO ORDERED this 25th day of September, 2018, Signed Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant United States of America. (Lowe, Virginia)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert C. Jones for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:18-cv-435-RCJ-CBC. (no image attached) (BLG)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/24/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EM)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Jean Merkelbach. Responses due by 10/8/2018. (Simons, Mark)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #4 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #4 using the appropriate docket entry title - (Motion for Preliminary Injunction). (no image attached) (BLG)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Jean Merkelbach. (Simons, Mark)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 TRANSMITTAL - Case History Docket Sheet with copies of documents filed from the 9th Judicial District Court Clerk, Minden, NV, Case No. 18-CV-00204-DC. (Attachments: #1 Pleadings) (KW)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/11/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/26/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 11, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial District Court, Douglas County, Case Number 18-cv00204, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 Pleadings filed in Ninth Judicial Court, Douglas County, NV)(Lowe, Virginia) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merkelbach v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Virginia Cronan Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Virginia Cronan Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Virginia Cronan Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Smittkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Merkelbach
Represented By: Mark G Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?