Randall v. Hanson Crawford Crum Family Law Group, LLP

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Randall and Jeffrey G Randall
Defendant: Hanson Crawford Crum Family Law Group, LLP
Case Number: 3:2018cv00479
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: William G Cobb
1 Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 22 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Dismiss,, #21 Motion for Leave to File Document by Plaintiff Jeffrey G Randall. Replies due by 12/14/2018. (Randall, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2018 21 First MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to MTD/Transfer by 12/7/18 re #15 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Jeffrey G Randall. (Randall, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2018 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/21/2018. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to ECF No. #15 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 20, 2018 19 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel William Munoz to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/4/2019. (no image attached) (BLG)
November 20, 2018 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Hanson Crawford Crum Family Law Group, LLP.(Garin, Joseph)
November 20, 2018 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hanson Crawford Crum Family Law Group, LLP. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Garin, Joseph)
November 20, 2018 16 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #15 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Hanson Crawford Crum Family Law Group, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Answer & Counterclaim, #3 Exhibit C Docket) (Garin, Joseph)
November 20, 2018 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Hanson Crawford Crum Family Law Group, LLP. Responses due by 12/4/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Joseph Crawford, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Tarah Powell-Chen) (Garin, Joseph) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER that Plaintif's Motion for Authorization to Register as an Electronic Filer in this Case ECF No. #5 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall contact the CM/ECF Help Desk at (702) 464-5555 to set up a CM/ECF account. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 16, 2018 13 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 ORDER - Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically, filed by Jeffrey G Randall (RFJ)
November 1, 2018 12 PROPOSED DEFAULT FORM by Jeffrey Randall. (Ref. ECF No. #11 Motion for Clerk's Default) (DRM)
November 1, 2018 11 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default, by Plaintiff Jeffrey Randall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Default) (DRM)
November 1, 2018 10 DECLARATION OF SERVICE/SUMMONS Returned Executed : Hanson Crawford Crum Family Law Group LLP served on 10/10/2018. (DRM)
October 31, 2018 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/31/2018. Before the court is Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #7 . Defendant requests an extension to and including November 21, 2018, in which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #7 is GRANTED. Defendant shall have to and including November 21, 2018, in which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
October 31, 2018 8 DECLARATION re #7 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendant Hanson Crawford Crum Family Law Group, LLP. (Garin, Joseph)
October 31, 2018 7 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint by Defendant Hanson Crawford Crum Family Law Group, LLP. (Garin, Joseph)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Authorization to Register as an Electronic Filer in This Case ECF No. #5 is GRANTED; Plaintiff must file a written certification that he has completed the CM/ECF tutorial and is familiar with Electronic Filing Procedures, Best Practices, and the Civil & Criminal Events Menu by 11/16/2018; after timely filing certification, contact the CM/ECF Help Desk to set up a CM/ECF account and familiarize himself with Part IC - Electronic Case Filing of the Local Rules of Practice of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 24, 2018 5 MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically, by Plaintiff Jeffrey Randall. (KR)
October 11, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Randall re ECF No. #2 Summons Issued. Hanson Crawford Crum Family Law Group, LLP served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (LH)
October 10, 2018 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (KW)
October 10, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
October 9, 2018 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hanson Crawford Crum Family Law Group, LLP re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (KW)
October 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Hanson Crawford Crum Family Law Group, LLP (Filing fee $400 PAID Receipt #NVRNO004304), filed by Jeffrey Randall. Proof of service due by 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randall v. Hanson Crawford Crum Family Law Group, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson Crawford Crum Family Law Group, LLP
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Represented By: William Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey G Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?