Doe I et al v. Carson City et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe I, Joann Doe II, JoAnn Doe III, John Doe I, Jane Doe II, JoAnn Doe I, Jane Doe III and John Doe II
Defendant: Carson City, City of and Does I-10
Case Number: 3:2018cv00538
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: William G Cobb
1 Judge: Howard D McKibben
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2019 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #9 Order on Stipulation, addressed to Matthew A. Work. (KW)
December 20, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER granting ECF No. #8 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Opposition to ECF No. #7 Carson City's Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 1/15/2019. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 20, 2018 8 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Extend Deadline to File Opposition to Motion to Defendant's re #7 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Jane Doe I. (Dion, Matthew)
December 18, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Carson City, City of. Responses due by 1/1/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/1/2019. (Robison, Kent) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 3, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JoAnn Doe I, John Doe II, Joann Doe II, Jane Doe I, JoAnn Doe III, John Doe I, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III. Carson City, City of served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Gillham, Casey)
November 26, 2018 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. 4 QC Notice, addressed to Matthew A. Work. (KW)
November 14, 2018 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorneys Matthew L. Dion and Mathew A. Work is advised to review and update their user account information. (no image attached) (BLG)
November 13, 2018 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carson City, City of. (LH)
November 13, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Howard D. McKibben and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
November 9, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jane Doe I, John Doe I, JoAnn Doe I, Jane Doe II, Joann Doe II, John Doe II, Jane Doe III, JoAnn Doe III. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gillham, Casey)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Carson City, Does I-10 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5317642) by JoAnn Doe I, John Doe II, Joann Doe II, Jane Doe I, JoAnn Doe III, John Doe I, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III. Proof of service due by 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gillham, Casey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe I et al v. Carson City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe I
Represented By: Casey A. Gillham
Represented By: Mathew A. Work
Represented By: Matthew L. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Doe II
Represented By: Casey A. Gillham
Represented By: Mathew A. Work
Represented By: Matthew L. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn Doe III
Represented By: Casey A. Gillham
Represented By: Mathew A. Work
Represented By: Matthew L. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe I
Represented By: Casey A. Gillham
Represented By: Mathew A. Work
Represented By: Matthew L. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe II
Represented By: Casey A. Gillham
Represented By: Mathew A. Work
Represented By: Matthew L. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn Doe I
Represented By: Casey A. Gillham
Represented By: Mathew A. Work
Represented By: Matthew L. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe III
Represented By: Casey A. Gillham
Represented By: Mathew A. Work
Represented By: Matthew L. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe II
Represented By: Casey A. Gillham
Represented By: Mathew A. Work
Represented By: Matthew L. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson City, City of
Represented By: Kent R. Robison
Represented By: Therese Shanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?