Waste Management of Nevada, Inc. v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union 533

Plaintiff: Waste Management of Nevada, Inc.
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union 533
Case Number: 3:2018cv00539
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
0 Judge: William G Cobb
1 Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 18 JUDGMENT - Permanent injunction is GRANTED (see ECF No. #17 ). Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 12/6/2018 for grammar (DRM).
December 6, 2018 Filing 17 PERMANENT INJUNCTION - Waste Management's request for a permanent injunction is GRANTED. This injunction applies to any dispute between the Union and Waste Management arising out of the Meal and Break Guidelines. (See pdf for additions specifics.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 6, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing held on 12/6/2018 before Judge Larry R. Hicks. Crtrm Administrator: J. Cotter; Pla Counsel: Mark Ricciardi and David Dornak; Def Counsel: Michael Langton; Court Reporter: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 9:35 a.m. - 9:39 a.m.; Courtroom: 3. The Court is advised that the parties have reached a settlement in this matter. Counsel provide a proposed permanent injunction to the Court for review. IT IS ORDERED that the submitted permanent injunction is approved. Upon stipulation of the parties, Plaintiff's request for a permanent injunction is GRANTED and the pending motion to dismiss (ECF No. #12 ) is DENIED as moot. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Waste Management of Nevada, Inc.. Replies due by 12/10/2018. (Dornak, David)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting ECF No. #10 Stipulation To Extend Time re ECF No. #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing scheduled for 12/6/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Sandra McCollum re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Complaint,, #3 Motion for TRO, #4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Waste Management of Nevada, Inc.. (Dornak, David)
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union 533. Responses due by 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Langton, Michael)
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Answer filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union 533. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/3/2019.(Langton, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) Hearing Date and Extension of Temporary Restraining Order re 7 Minute Order Setting Hearing, by Plaintiff Waste Management of Nevada, Inc.. (Dornak, David)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union 533 that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Langton, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Waste Management of Nevada, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dornak, David)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/14/2018. A Preliminary Injunction Hearing re Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #2 ) is set for Thursday, 12/6/2018, at 9:30 AM in Reno Courtroom 3 before Judge Larry R. Hicks. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that Waste Management's motion for a temporary restraining order (ECF No. #3 ) is GRANTED. The Union is ENJOINED from causing, encouraging, or participating in any strike, sympathy strike, slow-down, picketing, or any other activity which would tend to interfere with the orderly operations of Waste Management's business. The Court will be in contact with counsel for the parties to schedule a hearing on Waste Management's motion for a preliminary injunction (ECF No. #2 ). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/14/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #3 Motion for TRO by Plaintiff Waste Management of Nevada, Inc.. (Dornak, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union 533. (LH)
November 13, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. ***Emergency motion previously filed in case.*** (WJ)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Waste Management of Nevada, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Dornak, David)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Waste Management of Nevada, Inc.. Responses due by 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Dornak, David)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union 533 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5317780) by Waste Management of Nevada, Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dornak, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waste Management of Nevada, Inc. v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union 533
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union 533
Represented By: Michael E. Langton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waste Management of Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Dornak
Represented By: Mark J Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?