Dozier v. Dzurenda et al

Plaintiff: Scott Raymond Dozier
Defendant: William Gittere, Gregory Martin, Nevada Department of Corrections, David Drummond, James Dzurenda, William Reubart, Harold Wickham and Michele Ewing
Case Number: 3:2018cv00570
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
1 Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order 35 ORDER granting ECF No. #34 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 7, 2019 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Scott Raymond Dozier. (Anthony, David)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order 33 ORDER granting ECF No #32 Motion to Continue Hearing Date (First Request). Oral Argument on ECF Nos. #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining and #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction RESCHEDULED for 1/18/2019 at 10:00 A.M. in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 4, 2019 32 First MOTION to Continue Hearing by Plaintiff Scott Raymond Dozier. (Anthony, David)
January 3, 2019 31 NOTICE of Change in Hearing Location: Oral Argument re: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (ECF Nos. #6 , #8 ) set for 10:00 A.M., THURSDAY, JANUARY 10, 2019, in Reno Courtroom 4, before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached) (LE)
January 3, 2019 30 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Robert C. Jones, Senior District Judge on January 3, 2019, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (ECF Nos. 6, 8) is set for 10:00 A.M., THURSDAY, JANUARY 10, 2019, in Reno Courtroom 3, before Judge Robert C. Jones.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
December 28, 2018 28 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #27 Exhibit, #26 Reply : filer failed to comply with LR IC 2-2(b) and linked both documents to motion #8 . Counsel David Anthony advised to review the local rule for all future compliance. QC made the necessary correction to the docket, by linking both documents to motion #8 , and correction to the Judge's motion report. (no image attached) (WJ)
December 27, 2018 27 EXHIBIT In Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order with Notice and Preliminary Injunction to #26 Reply by Plaintiff Scott Raymond Dozier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 34, #2 Exhibit 35, #3 Exhibit 36) (Anthony, David) Modified on 12/28/2018 add link to motion #8 (WJ).
December 27, 2018 26 REPLY to #15 Response by Plaintiff Scott Raymond Dozier. (Anthony, David) Modified on 12/28/2018 add link to motion #8 (WJ).
December 27, 2018 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 12/27/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Katie Lynn Ogden. Due to a scheduling conflict with the court's calendar, the telephonic motions hearing regarding plaintiff's motion for temporary resting order with notice and preliminary injunction scheduled for Wednesday, 1/2/2019, at 1:00 p.m. (ECF No. 22), is VACATED and will be rescheduled to a date and time available for the court and counsel. The courtroom deputy will reach out to counsel to secure a future date and time for the motions hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 29 ORDER that defendants' motions to seal ECF Nos. #12 and #17 are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 12/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 21, 2018 24 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 12/21/2018. ORDER granting #23 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall have to and including December 27, 2018 to file a reply to the defendants' opposition to motion for temporary restraining order with notice and preliminary injunction. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
December 21, 2018 23 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Reply to re #6 Motion, #15 Response by Plaintiff Scott Raymond Dozier. (Anthony, David)
December 21, 2018 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 12/21/2018. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A telephonic motions hearing regarding plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order with notice and preliminary injunction (ECF No. #6 / #8 ) is set for 1/2/2019 at 01:00 PM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. Counsel shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 18570. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
December 19, 2018 21 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 400.00, receipt number NVLAS061028. (LH)
December 17, 2018 20 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #11 Appendix, 18 Appendix, #16 Appendix, 13 Sealed Unredacted Version of Filed Document: Filer failed to comply with LR IC 2-2(d) and link documents to their respective motions. QC linked documents to respective motions #6 #8 . QC made the necessary corrections to the docket sheet and judge's motion report. Filer advised to comply with LR IC 2-2(d) in all future filings. (no image attached) (WJ)
December 14, 2018 19 NOTICE Notice of UnderSeal Submission by James Dzurenda, Nevada Department of Corrections re #17 Motion to Seal, #15 Response. (Gilmer, D.)
December 14, 2018 17 MOTION to Seal by Defendants James Dzurenda, Nevada Department of Corrections. (Gilmer, D.)
December 14, 2018 16 APPENDIX to #15 Response by Defendants James Dzurenda, Nevada Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume 1, Part 2, #2 Appendix Volume 1, Part 3, #3 Appendix Volume 1, Part 4, #4 Appendix Volume 1, Part 5) (Gilmer, D.) Modified on 12/17/2018 add link to motion #8 (WJ).
December 14, 2018 15 RESPONSE to #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants James Dzurenda, Nevada Department of Corrections. Replies due by 12/21/2018. (Gilmer, D.)
December 14, 2018 14 NOTICE Notice of Under Seal Submission by James Dzurenda, Nevada Department of Corrections re #12 Motion to Seal. (Gilmer, D.)
December 14, 2018 12 MOTION to Seal by Defendants James Dzurenda, Nevada Department of Corrections. (Gilmer, D.)
December 14, 2018 11 APPENDIX to #10 Response by Defendants James Dzurenda, Nevada Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume 1, Part 2, #2 Appendix Volume 1, Part 3, #3 Appendix Volume 1, Part 4, #4 Appendix Volume 1, Part 5) (Gilmer, D.) Modified on 12/17/2018 linked to motion #6 (WJ).
December 14, 2018 10 RESPONSE to #6 Motion by Defendants James Dzurenda, Nevada Department of Corrections. Replies due by 12/21/2018. (Gilmer, D.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER that Plaintiff's IFP Application (ECF No. #1 ) is DENIED without prejudice; Clerk SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved IFP form for a prisoner and instructions (attached hereto for distribution); Fully complete IFP application or $400 filing fee due by 1/3/2019; if Plaintiff does not timely comply with this order, dismissal of this action may result; Clerk shall retain the complaint (ECF No. #2 ), but shall not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP for prisoners, #2 Instructions IFP for prisoners)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 30, 2018 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Scott Raymond Dozier. Responses due by 12/14/2018. (Anthony, David) (Note: QC assisted filing separated motion to create separate motion event pursuant to Local Rules.) (BLG)
November 30, 2018 7 EXHIBIT in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order with Notice and Preliminary Injunction to #6 Motion by Plaintiff Scott Raymond Dozier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33) (Anthony, David) Modified on 12/3/2018 link added to #8 . (BLG).
November 30, 2018 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Notice and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Scott Raymond Dozier. Responses due by 12/14/2018. (Anthony, David)
November 30, 2018 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Scott Raymond Dozier. (Anthony, David)
November 30, 2018 4 EXHIBIT in Support of Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief Due to Unconstitutional Conditions of Confinement to #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Scott Raymond Dozier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 Part 1, #6 Exhibit 5 Part 2, #7 Exhibit 5 Part 3, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #11 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 21a, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30) (Anthony, David)
November 30, 2018 3 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 Exhibit,. Attorney David Anthony advised to comply with LR 3-1 and file a properly completed civil cover sheet. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 30, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
November 30, 2018 2 EXHIBIT Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief Due to Unconstitutional Conditions of Confinement to #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Scott Raymond Dozier. (Anthony, David)
November 30, 2018 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Scott Raymond Dozier. (Anthony, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dozier v. Dzurenda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gittere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Reubart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Wickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Raymond Dozier
Represented By: Timothy R. Payne
Represented By: Lori C Teicher
Represented By: David S. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?