Newmont USA Limited a Delaware Corporation v. Imatech Systems Cyprus Pty Ltd dba Armorpipe Technologies et al
Plaintiff: Newmont USA Limited a Delaware Corporation
Defendant: Imatech Systems Cyprus Pty Ltd dba Armorpipe Technologies and International Materials & Technology Pty Limited dba Imatech
Case Number: 3:2018cv00575
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Howard D McKibben
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 ***Notes: Letters Rogatory (1) sent to Cypress 02/01/2019. (LG)
January 29, 2019 ***Notes: Letters Rogatory (2) sent to Australia 01/28/2019. (LG)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting ECF No. #4 Motion For Issuance of Letter/Rogatory (Cyprus). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting ECF No. #4 Motion For Issuance of Letter/Rogatory (Australia). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #4 Motion by Plaintiff Newmont USA Limited a Delaware Corporation. (Ferguson, Sarah)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #4 Motion by Plaintiff Newmont USA Limited a Delaware Corporation. (Ferguson, Sarah)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory by Plaintiff Newmont USA Limited a Delaware Corporation. Responses due by 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Ferguson, Sarah) Modified on 1/11/2019 duplicate text removed. (BLG).
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Newmont USA Limited a Delaware Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Newmont Mining Corporation, Corporate Parent Newmont Capital Limited, a Nevada corporation for Newmont USA Limited a Delaware Corporation added. (Addison, Matthew)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Imatech Systems Cyprus Pty Ltd dba Armorpipe Technologies, International Materials & Technology Pty Limited dba Imatech. (Attachments: #1 INTERNATIONAL MATERIALS & TECHNOLOGY PTY) (LH)
December 4, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Howard D. McKibben and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (BLG)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5346808) by Newmont USA Limited a Delaware Corporation. Proof of service due by 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Addison, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newmont USA Limited a Delaware Corporation v. Imatech Systems Cyprus Pty Ltd dba Armorpipe Technologies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imatech Systems Cyprus Pty Ltd dba Armorpipe Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Materials & Technology Pty Limited dba Imatech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newmont USA Limited a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Sylvia Harrison
Represented By: Sarah Ashley Ferguson
Represented By: Matthew C. Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?