Spilman v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Plaintiff: Christopher Spilman
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00580
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Howard D McKibben
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Spilman re #3 Summons Issued. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. waiver sent on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019. (Higbee, Mathew)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Howard D. McKibben for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:18-cv-0580-HDM-CBC. (no image attached) (WJ)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/11/2018. By Judicial Assistant: Elaine Muhlebach. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EM)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (KW)
December 10, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Christopher Spilman. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Higbee, Mathew)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5351089) by Christopher Spilman. Proof of service due by 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Higbee, Mathew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spilman v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Spilman
Represented By: Mathew K. Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?