Gentry et al v. U.S. Treasury Department
Plaintiff: Michael Edward Gentry and Laurie Anne Gentry
Defendant: U.S. Treasury Department
Case Number: 3:2018cv00581
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7426
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting ECF No. #12 for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. #1 Complaint. U.S. Treasury Department response/answer due 3/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 2/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #6 Motion by Defendant U.S. Treasury Department. Replies due by 2/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Stevko, Alexander)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to respond to complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant U.S. Treasury Department. (Stevko, Alexander)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 1/29/2019. The court has received and reviewed the defendant's notice of restoration of appropriations (ECF No. #10 ). The STAY in this case is lifted. The defendant shall respond to the "motion for claim of relief" on or before February 15, 2019. Plaintiff's motion to quash the plea for stay (ECF No. #9 ) is DENIED as moot. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of restoration of appropriations by U.S. Treasury Department. (Stevko, Alexander)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Quash Plea for Stay, by Plaintiff Michael Edward Gentry. Responses due by 2/5/2019. (DRM)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting ECF No. #7 Motion to Stay Motion Response Deadline in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 1/15/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Case re #6 Motion by Defendant U.S. Treasury Department. (Stevko, Alexander)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Claim of Relief; Constitution Question; Presumptive Taxation; Denial of Due Process, filed by Plaintiff Michael Edward Gentry. Responses due by 1/25/2019. (KW)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Service upon defendant Dept. of Treasury via certified mail on 12/26/2018. (DRM)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to U.S. Treasury Department, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LH)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER.This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/11/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (KW)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Treasury Department (Filing fee $400 PAID Receipt No. NVRNO004387), filed by Michael Edward Gentry, Laurie Anne Gentry (attachments filed under seal due to personal identifiers). Proof of service due by 3/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KW) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2018: #2 Certificate of Release of Federal Tax Lien, #3 SS Notice, #4 1040 Tax Return, #5 1040X Amended Tax Return, #6 IRS Notice, #7 Letter of Disaggrement, #8 Collection Appeal Request) (KW).
December 10, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentry et al v. U.S. Treasury Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Treasury Department
Represented By: Alexander E. Stevko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Edward Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Anne Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?