Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC v. Thermoplan USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Thermoplan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00603
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
2 Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 19 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Thermoplan USA, Inc.. (Goddard, Leigh)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting ECF No. #14 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to ECF No. #1 Complaint. Thermoplan USA, Inc.'s answer/response due 2/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 1/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 24, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:18-cv-0603-RCJ-CBC. (no image attached) (WJ)
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/24/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Wayne Julian. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - WJ)
January 23, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Thermoplan USA, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Thermoplan AG for Thermoplan USA, Inc. added. (Goddard, Leigh)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Thermoplan USA, Inc.. (Goddard, Leigh)
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Leigh T Goddard on behalf of Defendant Thermoplan USA, Inc.. (Goddard, Leigh)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER approving ECF No. #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph P. Oldaker on behalf of Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/9/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER approving ECF No. #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy E. Grochocinski on behalf of Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/9/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Joseph P. Oldaker and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5384940) by Plaintiff Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Timothy E. Grochocinski and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5384888) by Plaintiff Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC. (Rounds, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC. Thermoplan USA, Inc. served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Rounds, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/2/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (KW)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thermoplan USA, Inc. re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (KW)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Joseph P. Oldaker to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 2/11/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Timothy E. Grochocinski to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 2/11/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
December 28, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (WJ)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rounds, Michael)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thermoplan USA, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5374463) by Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC. Proof of service due by 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons)(Rounds, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC v. Thermoplan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverage Dispensing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Timothy E. Grochocinski
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Joseph P. Oldaker
Represented By: Timothy E Grochocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermoplan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Leigh T Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?