Glisson v. Furlong et al

Plaintiff: Chris Glisson
Defendant: McFall, Primka, Lots, Carson City Jail Commander, Wildblood and Furlong
Case Number: 3:2019cv00025
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
0 Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
1 Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Chris Glisson. (KW)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to SEND plaintiff instructions and approved form application for I.F.P. (sent to p via NNCC Law Library on 1/18/2019); plaintiff to file a fully complete application for I.F.P. or pay the full $400 filing fee by 2/17/2019; if plaintiff does not timeoly comply with this order, dismissal of this action may result; Clerk directed to retain the Complaint ECF No. #1 -1, but will not file at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Instruction, #2 IFP Form)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE - No IFP Application or Filing Fee Received with Initiating Document(s) by Chris Glisson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Financial Certificate, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glisson v. Furlong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McFall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson City Jail Commander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wildblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Glisson
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?