Penrose v. Quality Loan Service, Corp.
Plaintiff: Herbert S. Penrose
Defendant: Mortgage Electonic Registration System, MERS, Greewich Capital Acceptance, Inc., Greenwich Capital Financial Products, Inc., Quality Loan Service, Corp., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP, First Magnus Financial Corporation, Cooper and Mr. Cooper
Case Number: 3:2019cv00027
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Mortgage Electonic Registration System, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Wittig, Donna)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/26/2019. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to ECF No. #8 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendants Mortgage Electonic Registration System, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. Responses due by 3/11/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA) (Wittig, Donna) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Plaintiff Herbert S. Penrose re ECF No. #1 Complaint. Object: Hard Copy of Colored Exhibits, manually filed with the Clerk's Office. (KW)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBITS to ECF No. #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Herbert S. Penrose. (DRM)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: Filer Action Required to #1 Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Notice of Lis Pendens. Herbert S. Penrose advised to comply with LR 3-1 and file a properly completed civil cover sheet. (no image attached) (WJ)
January 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Herbert S. Penrose. (DRM)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re ECF No. #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Herbert S. Penrose. (DRM)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 PAID; Receipt No. NVRNO-004420) by Herbert S. Penrose. Proof of service due by 4/17/2019.(DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penrose v. Quality Loan Service, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electonic Registration System
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greewich Capital Acceptance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Capital Financial Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Magnus Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert S. Penrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?