Lucero v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Joseph Lucero
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2019cv00057
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Kramer Marriott on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Marriott, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re ECF No. #7 Summons Issued as to USA. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (KW)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security re ECF No. #6 Complaint (Issued per ECF No. #5 Order - order, summons and complaint distributed to USM for service on 2/20/2019). (KW)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, by Joseph Lucero (Issued per ECF No. #5 Order). Proof of service due by 5/21/2019.(KW)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff's application to proceed IFP is GRANTED. The complaint shall PROCEED. Clerk shall FILE the complaint ECF #1 -1. Clerk shall SERVE Commissioner SSA by sending a copy of the Summons and Complaint by certified mail to: Regional Chief Counsel and U. S. Attorney General (Cert Mail # 7013 1710 0001 6894 3591, 7013 1710 0001 6894 3607 ). Clerk shall ISSUE a summons to SSA and deliver summons and complaint for service by USM on U.S. Attorney's Office, Reno. (Summons and complaint to USM on 2/20/2019. ) Plaintiff shall serve Defendant or defendant's attorney a copy every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER approving ECF No. #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Erik W. Berger on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Lucero and approving Designation of Local Counsel Hal Taylor. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/13/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Erik W. Berger and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5428565) by Plaintiff Joseph Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cert. Good Standing) (Taylor, Hal)
February 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Joseph Lucero. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #3 Summons U.S.Atty., #4 Summons Atty.Genl, #5 Summons OGC) (Taylor, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucero v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lucero
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Erik W. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Michael Kramer Marriott
Represented By: Nicholas Trutanich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?