United States of America v. $73,360 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $73,360 in United States Currency
Claimant: Maciej Braunstein
Case Number: 3:2019cv00075
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #9 . Attorney J. Craig Demetras is advised to review and update his user account information. (no image attached) (BLG)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CLAIM Verified by Claimant Maciej Braunstein. (Demetras, James)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proof of Publication by United States of America.. (Addington, Gregory)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 USM/RETURN NOTICE of Filing Service of Process - Warrant of Arrest in Rem by United States of America. (Addington, Gregory) Modified on 2/28/2019 event correction. (BLG).
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Order,, #1 Complaint in Forfeiture, #5 Summons Issued by Plaintiff United States of America. (Addington, Gregory)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS AND WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM FOR PROPERTY AND NOTICE Issued as to $73,360 in United States Currency re ECF No. #1 Complaint in Forfeiture. (KW)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR SUMMONS AND WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM FOR PROPERTY AND NOTICE that a Summons and Warrant of Arrest issue against the property named in the Complaint and that the United States of America seize arrest, and take into custody defendant $73,360.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, and that all persons claiming an interest in the property must file a verified claim; notice of the action and the arrest be given by the U.S. by publication; U.S. shall file proof of publication and service with the Clerk. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 proposed Warrant of Arrest in Rem) (Addington, Gregory)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/12/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
February 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN FORFEITURE against $73,360 in United States Currency by United States of America. Proof of service due by 5/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Addington, Gregory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $73,360 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $73,360 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maciej Braunstein
Represented By: James C Demetras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?