Foss-Stahl v. Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC

Plaintiff: Catherine Foss-Stahl
Defendant: Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC and Cerca Trova Southwest Restaurant Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00228
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, filed by Cerca Trova Southwest Restaurant Group, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/9/2019.(Greiner, Jill) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CORRECTED ORDER approving ECF No. #10 Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant Outback Steakhouse Of Florida, LLC Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION For Dismissal Of Defendant Outback Steakhouse Of Florida, LLC Without Prejudice re #5 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Cerca Trova Southwest Restaurant Group, LLC. (Greiner, Jill)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving ECF No. #8 Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant Outback Steakhouse of Florida LLC. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION For Dismissal Of Defendant Outback Steakhouse Of Florida, LLC With Prejudice re #5 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Cerca Trova Southwest Restaurant Group, LLC. (Greiner, Jill)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Foss-Stahl re #6 Summons Issued, #5 Amended Complaint,. Cerca Trova Southwest Restaurant Group, LLC served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Mausert, Mark)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cerca Trova Southwest Restaurant Group LLC re ECF No. #5 Amended Complaint. (KR)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC, Cerca Trova Southwest Restaurant Group, LLC by Catherine Foss-Stahl. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 8/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons)(Mausert, Mark)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Foss-Stahl re #3 Summons Issued. Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Mausert, Mark)
May 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb for ENE. (LE)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (LH)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Catherine Foss-Stahl. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mausert, Mark)
May 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (LE)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5533071) by Catherine Foss-Stahl. Proof of service due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Mausert, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foss-Stahl v. Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerca Trova Southwest Restaurant Group, LLC
Represented By: Jill Irene Greiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Foss-Stahl
Represented By: Mark L. Mausert
Represented By: Cody M. Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?