Perrine v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Andrea Perrine
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00248
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The court accepts defendant's removal of this action and exercise diversity jurisdiction over the complaint. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Green, Andrew)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 Order, by Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Green, Andrew)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 6/5/2019. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A case management conference is set for 9/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. Out-of-town counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for this hearing and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 19248. The parties shall jointly file a case management report by no later than Tuesday, August 20, 2019. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Green, Andrew)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that defendant is granted twenty (20) days from the entry of this order to establish the minimum amount in controversy for federal jurisdiction. Plaintiff is granted ten (10) days to file an opposition. No reply is required. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/1/2019.(Green, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/13/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/28/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 13, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (LE)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company added. (Hevrin, Rikki)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial Court, Washoe County, Nevada, Case Number CV19-00558, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5544256) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hevrin, Rikki) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perrine v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Rikki Jo Hevrin
Represented By: Andrew C Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Perrine
Represented By: Jonathan J Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?