Melton v. Allergan Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Katherine E. Melton
Defendant: General Electric, Mentor Worldwide LLC., Allergan Inc., Dow Corning and Mentor Worldwide LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00298
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the District Judge enter an order: (1) GRANTING Plaintiff's IFP application (ECF No. #1 ). (2) The complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) should be FILED. (3) The action should be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; however, the action should be administratively closed. Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET to ECF No. #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Katherine E. Melton. (LH)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Action Required to #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Katherine E. Melton advised to comply with LR 3-1 and file a properly completed civil cover sheet. A civil cover sheet is enclosed and must be filed in your case. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 6/24/2019 COMPLIED (WJ).
June 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LH)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Katherine E. Melton. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melton v. Allergan Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentor Worldwide LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Corning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentor Worldwide LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine E. Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?