Stinson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jolene R. Stinson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00334
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re ECF No. #7 Summons Issued. Andrew Saul served on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/28/2019. (LH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada. Filed and distributed per ECF No. #5 Order. (LH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jolene R. Stinson. Filed and distributed per ECF No. #5 Order. (LH)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff's IFP Application (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED; the Complaint shall PROCEED; the Clerk instructed to FILE the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1); the Clerk shall SERVE Commissioner SSA by sending a copy of the Summons and Complaint by certified mail to: Regional Chief Counsel and U.S. Attorney General (Cert Mail # 7013 1710 0001 6894 3089 and 7013 1710 0001 6894 3072); the Clerk shall ISSUE a summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver summons and complaint to USM for service on U.S. Attorney' Office, Reno (Summons, complaint and copy of this order delivered to USM on 7/19/2019); plaintiff shall serve defendant a copy every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Karl E. Osterhout for Jolene R. Stinson, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Hal Taylor. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/1/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Karl E. Osterhout and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5603079) by Plaintiff Jolene R. Stinson. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing) (Taylor, Hal)
June 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jolene R. Stinson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jolene R. Stinson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #3 Summons U.S.Atty., #4 Summons Atty.Gen., #5 Summons OGC)(Taylor, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stinson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolene R. Stinson
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?