Fontes v. Chhina Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Krystal Fontes
Defendant: Chhina Foods, Inc. and Ranbir Chhina
Case Number: 3:2019cv00350
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 8/16/2019. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A Status Conference concerning the early neutral evaluation is set for 9/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. At the status conference, counsel shall be prepared to discuss the following matters: (1) Initial disclosures pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1); (2) The parties who will attend the ENE; and (3) Any pending motions which may affect the ENE. The status conference will be vacated if the parties file a joint ENE status report on or before Monday, September 16, 2019, which certifies that the parties have made initial disclosures pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1), and that the plaintiff has provided a computation of damages to defendant pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1)(A)(iii). IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 9/25/2019 at 01:30 PM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. The ENE written evaluation statements shall be delivered to chambers, Suite 404, no later than Wednesday, September 18, 2019 at 4:00 P.M. DO NOT DELIVER OR MAIL THEM TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE. DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 8/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ranbir Chhina, Chhina Foods, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bowen, Dan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Ranbir Chhina, Chhina Foods, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/20/2019.(Bowen, Dan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting ECF No. #6 Stipulation : Answer/response to ECF No. #1 Complaint due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendants Ranbir Chhina, Chhina Foods, Inc.. (Bowen, Dan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krystal Fontes re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,. Chhina Foods, Inc. served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Mausert, Mark)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krystal Fontes re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,. Ranbir Chhina served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Mausert, Mark)
June 24, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to Ranbir Chhina, Chhina Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ranbir Chhina) (LH)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Krystal Fontes. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mausert, Mark)
June 24, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry for ENE. (WJ)
June 24, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5598923) by Krystal Fontes. Proof of service due by 9/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Mausert, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontes v. Chhina Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Fontes
Represented By: Mark L. Mausert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chhina Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Dan C. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranbir Chhina
Represented By: Dan C. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?