Sayana et al v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Narciso Eleazar Sayana and Leonarda Caong Sayana
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan, Walter L Haith and William P Barr
Case Number: 3:2019cv00370
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to William P. Barr, Walter L. Haith, Kevin K. McAleenan. (KR)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Leonarda Caong Sayana. (Ahmad, Saad)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Saad Ahmad is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting ECF No. #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Saad Ahmad for Leonarda Caong Sayana, and approving designation of local counsel. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Saad Ahmad and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jon Eric Garde (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5611717) by Plaintiff Leonarda Caong Sayana. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing) (Garde, Jon)
July 2, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Saad Ahmad to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/16/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 2, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5610119) by Leonarda Sayana. Proof of service due by 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Garde, Jon) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sayana et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter L Haith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narciso Eleazar Sayana
Represented By: Saad Ahmad
Represented By: Jon E Garde,
Represented By: Jon E Garde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonarda Caong Sayana
Represented By: Jon E Garde
Represented By: Saad Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?