Champion Residential Services, Inc. v. Sierra Air, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Champion Residential Services, Inc.
Defendant: Ronald L. Ford, Sierra Air, Inc. and Rickey Hayes Jr.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00375
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (KR)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER re ECF No. #9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/27/2020. Motions due by 5/27/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Champion Residential Services, Inc. (Zhong, Meng)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Samantha Jane Reviglio on behalf of Defendants Ronald L. Ford, Rickey Hayes Jr., Sierra Air, Inc.. (Reviglio, Samantha)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ronald L. Ford, Rickey Hayes Jr., Sierra Air, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Zorio, Arthur)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Ronald L. Ford, Rickey Hayes Jr., Sierra Air, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/12/2019.(Zorio, Arthur) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Champion Residential Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. Ronald L. Ford served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Rickey Hayes Jr. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Sierra Air, Inc. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (McCue, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to All Defendants re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ronald L. Ford, #2 Summons Rickey Hayes Jr.) (KR)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (KR)
July 3, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Champion Residential Services, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McCue, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5611783) by Champion Residential Services, Inc.. Proof of service due by 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(McCue, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champion Residential Services, Inc. v. Sierra Air, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald L. Ford
Represented By: Arthur A Zorio
Represented By: Samantha Jane Reviglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Air, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur A Zorio
Represented By: Samantha Jane Reviglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickey Hayes Jr.
Represented By: Arthur A Zorio
Represented By: Samantha Jane Reviglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Champion Residential Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?