Schnieder v. United States of America
Petitioner: James Norman Schnieder
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00377
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that Schnieder's motion for refund of the $400 he paid in filing his Petition for Writ of Mandamus (ECF No. #6 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/20/2019. (Ad hoc email (NEF) to Finance on 8/20/2019.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Refund re ECF No. #5 Receipt of Filing Fee by Petitioner James Norman Schnieder. Responses due by 8/30/2019. (LH)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/10/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. On July 5, 2019, Plaintiff sent a letter to the Court to assert complaints about alleged Federal Government conduct but failed to pay the filing fee. (ECF No. #1 ) The letter is also an improper attempt to initiate an action. Plaintiff submitted a letter dated the same date stating he was asked to complete a form seeking information about the parties and requiring payment of a filing fee. (ECF No. #3 .) In the same letter, Plaintiff stated that he would like to withdraw his case (id.) Plaintiff did not properly initiate this action. Regardless, his request to withdraw is granted. The Clerk is directed to close this improperly filed case. Case terminated. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
July 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 400.00 PAID, receipt number NVRNO-004619. (DRM)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal - Withdrawal of Case, by Petitioner James Norman Schnieder. (KR)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE - No IFP Application or Filing Fee Received with Initiating Document(s) submitted on behalf of Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schnieder v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Norman Schnieder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?