Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169 v. The Penta Building Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169
Defendant: The Penta Building Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00401
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award by Defendant The Penta Building Group, Inc., Counter Claimant The Penta Building Group, Inc.. (Cecil, Matthew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/13/2019.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by The Penta Building Group, Inc.. filed by The Penta Building Group, Inc..(Cecil, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169. The Penta Building Group, Inc. waiver sent on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Langton, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service by Petitioner Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169. (Langton, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Penta Building Group Inc re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (KR)
July 17, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Langton, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT to #1 Complaint,, by Petitioner Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Langton, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT exhibit 1-F to #1 Complaint,, by Petitioner Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-F)(Langton, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBIT Exhibit 1-D to #1 Complaint,, by Petitioner Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-E)(Langton, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT Exhibit 1-D to #1 Complaint,, by Petitioner Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Langton, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Exhibit 1-C to #1 Complaint,, by Petitioner Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-C)(Langton, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT to #1 Complaint,, by Petitioner Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-B)(Langton, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Exhibit 1-A to #1 Complaint,, by Petitioner Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Langton, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Penta Building Group, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5626511) by Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169. Proof of service due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Be Issued)(Langton, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169 v. The Penta Building Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 169
Represented By: Michael E. Langton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Penta Building Group, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T. Cecil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?