Davis v. Saul
Plaintiff: Randy Blair Davis
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00402
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to Commissioner Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (KR)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER approving ECF No. #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Melissa A. Palmer on behalf of plaintiff Randy Blair Davis and approving Designation of Local Counsel Hal Taylor. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/17/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 17, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
July 17, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Melissa A. Palmer and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5626542) by Plaintiff Randy Blair Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Designation of Agent) (Taylor, Hal)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Randy Blair Davis. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5626393) by Randy Blair Davis. Proof of service due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons OGC, #3 Summons USAG, #4 Summons USAO)(Taylor, Hal) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Blair Davis
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?