Solak v. Rochford et al
Plaintiff: John Solak
Defendant: Clayton E. Woodrum, Kelly Hoffman, Stanley M. McCabe, Anthony B. Petrelli, Lloyd T. Rochford, David A. Fowler and Regina Roesener
Nominal Defendant: Ring Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00410
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (SC)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No. #69 Stipulation. Discovery due by 11/12/2021. Motions due by 12/17/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC) Modified on 7/6/2021 to amend title (SC).
July 6, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #69 Stipulation by Plaintiff John Solak. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (OMara, David)
July 2, 2021 Filing 69 Second STIPULATION re Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re 63 Settlement Conference,,,,, by Plaintiff John Solak. (OMara, David)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER granting ECF No. #67 Stipulated Protective Order. Paragraph 6 is modified to reflect that any motion regarding filing confidential information and motions to seal shall also comply with the requirements of Kamakana v. City and County of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172 (9th Cir. 2006). See also, Center for Auto Safety v. Chrysler Group, LLC, 809 F.3d 1092, 1097 (9th Cir. 2016). Paragraph 10 is modified to reflect that although the parties may agree to be bound by the confidentiality terms of this Order beyond the conclusion of this lawsuit, the dismissal of this action will terminate the jurisdiction of this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/25/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
June 24, 2021 Filing 67 Joint STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendants David A. Fowler, Kelly Hoffman, Stanley M. McCabe, Anthony B. Petrelli, Lloyd T. Rochford, Regina Roesener, Clayton E. Woodrum, Nominal Defendant Ring Energy, Inc.. (Curtis, Cory)
May 26, 2021 Filing 66 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Cory M. Curtis is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER approving ECF No. #64 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cory M. Curtis for all Defendants and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Michael N. Feder. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/24/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
May 24, 2021 Filing 64 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Cory M. Curtis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6496986) by Defendant Lloyd T. Rochford. (Feder, Michael)
March 3, 2021 Filing 63 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Video Settlement Conference held on 3/3/2021 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Karen Walker; Pla Counsel: Jeffrey Norton, Esq., David O'Mara, Esq. and Benjamin Baker, Esq.; Def Counsel: Marie Carlisle, Esq., Michael Feder, Esq. and Mark Jones, Esq.; Court Reporter: Liberty Court Recorder; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m. - 10:30 a.m.; Recording start and end times: 9:04:05 a.m. - 9:22:20 a.m.; Courtroom: 2. After private discussions and negotiations, the parties advised the court that a settlement was not reached. The court discusses the scheduling order with the parties and sets the following deadlines: Discovery Cut-off: 9/10/2021Amend the pleadings or join parties: 5/28/2021Initial Expert Disclosure: 6/4/2021Rebuttal Expert Disclosure: 8/6/2021Dispositive Motions: 10/15/2021Joint Pre-trial Order: 11/19/2021In the event dispositive motions are filed, the deadline for filing the proposed joint pretrial order will be suspended until thirty (30) days after decision on the dispositive motions or further court order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 18, 2021 Filing 62 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint Defendants' Answer to Amended Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by David A. Fowler, Kelly Hoffman, Stanley M. McCabe, Anthony B. Petrelli, Ring Energy, Inc., Lloyd T. Rochford, Regina Roesener, Clayton E. Woodrum.(Feder, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Scheduling Video Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for Wednesday, 3/3/2021 at 9:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 2 by videoconference before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Settlement Conference Statements due in chambers, Ste. 405 by Wednesday, 2/24/2021 by 4:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting ECF No. #59 Stipulation : (1) The deadline for the parties to contact the courtroom deputy for the purpose of scheduling a mediation with the magistrate judge shall be extended until 30 days from the date of entry of this Order (2/12/2021); and (2) The deadline for the parties to submit an amended Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order shall be extended until 30 days after the date of the mediation with the magistrate judge, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 13, 2021 Filing 59 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re Discovery and Schedule Mediation re #45 Minute Order, by Plaintiff John Solak. (OMara, David)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. #55 ) is granted in part. Plaintiff may proceed on the claims in his First Amended Complaint (ECF No. #42 ) only to the extent his claims are based on alleged misconduct that occurred after January 22, 2019, when Plaintiff purchased Ring stock. It is otherwise denied. The Court's judgment (ECF No. #54 ) dismissing this case is vacated. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 1, 2020 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to #55 Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff John Solak. (OMara, David)
September 24, 2020 Filing 56 RESPONSE to #55 Motion for Reconsideration by Defendants David A. Fowler, Kelly Hoffman, Stanley M. McCabe, Anthony B. Petrelli, Lloyd T. Rochford, Regina Roesener, Clayton E. Woodrum. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Feder, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Reconsideration re #53 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order Dismissing Case, by Plaintiff John Solak. Responses due by 9/25/2020. (OMara, David)
September 3, 2020 Filing 54 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. #48 ) the first amended complaint is granted; Clerk directed to enter judgment in accordance with this order and to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
August 27, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to #48 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants David A. Fowler, Kelly Hoffman, Stanley M. McCabe, Anthony B. Petrelli, Lloyd T. Rochford, Regina Roesener, Clayton E. Woodrum, Nominal Defendant Ring Energy, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
August 12, 2020 Filing 51 RESPONSE to #48 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff John Solak. Replies due by 8/19/2020. (OMara, David)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting ECF No. #49 Stipulation. Plaintiff shall have until August 13, 2020 to file his opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #48 ) and Defendants shall have 15 days to file a Reply.The deadline for the parties to contact the Courtroom Deputy for the purpose of scheduling mediation (ECF No. #45 ) shall be extended until 10 days following a decision on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 8, 2020 Filing 49 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #45 Minute Order, #48 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff John Solak. (OMara, David)
June 30, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants David A. Fowler, Kelly Hoffman, Stanley M. McCabe, Anthony B. Petrelli, Lloyd T. Rochford, Regina Roesener, Clayton E. Woodrum, Nominal Defendant Ring Energy, Inc.. Responses due by 7/14/2020. (Feder, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael N Feder. (Feder, Michael)
May 12, 2020 Filing 46 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Regina Roesener on 5/1/2020 executed by John Solak re #42 Amended Complaint. (OMara, David)
April 30, 2020 Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/30/2020. In paragraph 9 of ECF No. #41 , the parties state they are amenable to engaging in mediation of this matter. The parties shall contact courtroom deputy, Karen Walker, at (775) 686-5918 or Karen_Walker@nvd.uscourts.gov re scheduling a date for the mediation. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 30, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (AB)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SCHEDULING ORDER/ORDER granting ECF No. #41 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order as follows: - Discovery due by October 28, 2020- Dispositive Motions due by November 25, 2020- Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by December 23, 2020(See PDF image for additional details). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 29, 2020 Filing 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by John Solak. No changes to parties. (OMara, David) Modified on 4/30/2020 Regina Roesener added on docket sheet . (WJ).
April 29, 2020 Filing 41 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Nominal Defendant Ring Energy, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting ECF No. #22 Motion to Dismiss. The claims alleged in the Complaint are dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. Plaintiff will have 15 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint to cure the deficiencies of the claims as discussed herein. Plaintiff's failure to timely file an amended complaint will result in dismissal of Plaintiff's claims with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 14, 2020 Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/14/2020. In light of the Court's order (ECF NO. #37 ) granting Marie Carlisle's Verified Petition (ECF No. #36 ), the Verified Petition filed as ECF No. #31 is denied as moot. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
December 5, 2019 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Marie L. Carlisle is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #36 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marie L. Carlisle for Defendants, Lloyd T. Rochford, et al., and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/4/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 2, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marie L. Carlisle and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5795856) by Defendant David A. Fowler, Nominal Defendant Ring Energy, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
November 19, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRM)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER re ECF No. #33 Proposed Order : Discovery due by 6/29/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/28/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 15, 2019 Filing 33 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants David A. Fowler, Kelly Hoffman, Stanley M. McCabe, Anthony B. Petrelli, Lloyd T. Rochford, Clayton E. Woodrum, Nominal Defendant Ring Energy, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/15/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Petitioner Marie L. Carlisle has filed a motion for permission to practice pro hac vice (ECF No. #31 .) Only one defendant, whose name looks like it could be Lloyd T. Rochford, has signed on page 5 of the petition, yet the petition reflects Ms. Carlisle will represent all the listed defendants. Petitioner Marie L. Carlisle is directed to obtain the signatures of all her clients and refile the petition (ECF No. #31 using the event Notice of Corrected Image and link the corrected image to the original petition (ECF No. #31 .) Petitioner is directed to file the corrected image by 11/29/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
November 15, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marie L. Carlisle and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5778320) by Defendants David A. Fowler, Kelly Hoffman, Stanley M. McCabe, Anthony B. Petrelli, Lloyd T. Rochford, Clayton E. Woodrum, Nominal Defendant Ring Energy, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 30 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Marie L. Carlisle to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/25/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
October 21, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to #22 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants David A. Fowler, Kelly Hoffman, Stanley M. McCabe, Anthony B. Petrelli, Lloyd T. Rochford, Clayton E. Woodrum, Nominal Defendant Ring Energy, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
October 14, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #22 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff John Solak. Replies due by 10/21/2019. (Norton, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/2/2019. Good cause appearing, Plaintiff's motion (ECF No. #26 ) is granted. The Clerk is directed to strike Mr. Kranenburg's name from the docket as counsel of record in this case. Attorney Werner R. Kranenburg terminated. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief re 25 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP,,, by Plaintiff John Solak. Responses due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order) (OMara, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Werner R. Kranenburg to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/15/2019. Failure to comply with LR IA 11-2 may result in further action by the Court. (no image attached) (PAV)
September 30, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Marie L. Carlisle to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/14/2019. (no image attached) (LE)
September 30, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by David A. Fowler, Kelly Hoffman, Stanley M. McCabe, Anthony B. Petrelli, Ring Energy, Inc., Lloyd T. Rochford, Clayton E. Woodrum. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Feder, Michael)
September 30, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendants David A. Fowler, Kelly Hoffman, Stanley M. McCabe, Anthony B. Petrelli, Lloyd T. Rochford, Clayton E. Woodrum, Nominal Defendant Ring Energy, Inc.. Responses due by 10/14/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/14/2019. (Feder, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 13, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #20 Notice (Other). Attorney Jeffrey Norton advised to comply with Local Rule IA 10-2 and refile #20 Notice as a motion with the correct formant as prescribed by the local rule. (no image attached) (LE)
September 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by John Solak re 19 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP,,,. (Norton, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Werner R. Kranenburg to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/16/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Jeffrey M. Norton is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Solak. David A. Fowler waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019; Kelly Hoffman waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019; Stanley M. McCabe waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019; Anthony B. Petrelli waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019; Ring Energy, Inc. waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019; Lloyd T. Rochford waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019; Clayton E. Woodrum waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (OMara, David)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER approving ECF No. #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jeffrey M. Norton on behalf of Plaintiff John Solak and approving Designation of Local Counsel David C. O'Mara. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/22/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Norton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David C. O'Mara (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5674404) by Plaintiff John Solak. (OMara, David)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting ECF No. #13 Motion to Substitute Attorney : David C. O'Mara substituted in the place and stead of Attorney Soomi Kim, for Plaintiff, John Solak. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/20/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney David C. O'Mara in for Attorney Soomi Kim by Plaintiff John Solak. (OMara, David)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/16/2019, re ECF No. #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney, directing Plaintiff to submit a revised motion which complies with the Local Rules provision regarding consent of the represented client. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Attorney David C. O'Mara in for Attorney Soomi Kim by Plaintiff John Solak. (OMara, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 SECOND NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to 7 Notice Attorney Action Required. Attorney Soomi Kim advised to review local rule LR IA 11-1(b) and file the necessary paperwork for compliance. (no image attached) (WJ)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. 2 . Attorney Soomi Kim is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (WJ)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re Standing Order addressed to Jeffrey M. Norton. (LH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #1 Complaint. Attorney Soomi Kim advised to review local rule LR IA 11-1(b) and file the necessary paperwork for compliance. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Docket Correction to 4 Notice Certificate of Interested Parties LR 7.1-1. Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP: entry filed in error. Please disregard. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Werner R. Kranenburg to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/2/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 DISREGARD see 6 NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court., NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Werner R. Kranenburg to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney.( Verified Petition due by 9/2/2019.) (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 7/19/2019 entry made in error. (WJ).
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jeffrey M. Norton to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/2/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Soomi Kim is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (WJ)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5629972) by John Solak. Proof of service due by 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kim, Soomi) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
July 19, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solak v. Rochford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton E. Woodrum
Represented By: Marie Carlisle
Represented By: Michael N Feder
Represented By: Cory Murray Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Hoffman
Represented By: Marie Carlisle
Represented By: Michael N Feder
Represented By: Cory Murray Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley M. McCabe
Represented By: Marie Carlisle
Represented By: Michael N Feder
Represented By: Cory Murray Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony B. Petrelli
Represented By: Marie Carlisle
Represented By: Michael N Feder
Represented By: Cory Murray Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd T. Rochford
Represented By: Marie Carlisle
Represented By: Michael N Feder
Represented By: Cory Murray Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Fowler
Represented By: Marie Carlisle
Represented By: Michael N Feder
Represented By: Cory Murray Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Roesener
Represented By: Marie Carlisle
Represented By: Michael N Feder
Represented By: Cory Murray Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Solak
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Norton
Represented By: Werner R. Kranenburg
Represented By: Soomi Kim
Represented By: David C OMara
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Ring Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Marie Carlisle
Represented By: Michael N Feder
Represented By: Cory Murray Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?