Bass v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Harriston Lee Bass, Jr.
Respondent: Regina Baker, Nevada Attorney General and Nevada, State of
Case Number: 3:2019cv00411
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Waiver of Page Limitations, by Petitioner Harriston Lee Bass, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (DRM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Petitioner Harriston Lee Bass, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (DRM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Harriston Lee Bass, Jr. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Procedural History, #2 Exhibits, #3 Table of Contents, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Copy of Order #3, #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(DRM)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Petitioner's IFP Application (ECF No. #1 ) is granted; Amended Petition due by 9/4/2019; Clerk directed to send Petitioner two copies of the Court's form for 28 U.S.C. 2254 petitions (Mailed to P on 8/5/2019). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Regina Baker, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:19-cv-00411-MMD-WGC. (LH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Harriston Lee Bass, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Exhibit, #3 Motion for Waiver of Page Limitations, #4 Motion for Counsel)(LH)
July 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bass v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harriston Lee Bass, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Regina Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?